Adam J Klecker and Ekaterina Litovtchenko
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Texas (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-40972 (txeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Appearance
1
05/10/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Adam j Klecker and Ekaterina Litovtchenko
doc
06/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors
06/10/2018
Notice of Missing Documents to Individual Debtor (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
06/13/2018
Certificate of Mailing
16
09/25/2018
Amended Schedules and/or Amended Matrix
19
12/02/2018
Certificate of Mailing
20
02/06/2019
Reconciliation Concerning Claims

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.