Adam J. Vybiral
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Pennsylvania (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-10861 (pawb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
08/26/2018
Creditor Request for Notices
13
11/29/2018
Relief from Stay
14
11/29/2018
Hearing on a Judge Agresti Case Set by Attorney or Trustee
11/29/2018
none (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/29/2018
Abandon
17
11/29/2018
Hearing on a Judge Agresti Case Set by Attorney or Trustee
11/29/2018
none (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
12/19/2018
Certificate of No Objection
21
12/19/2018
Certificate of No Objection
22
12/20/2018
Abandon
24
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
25
12/23/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
26
01/28/2019
Notice Reminder to File Financial Management Course Certificate
27
01/31/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk
29
02/13/2019
Discharging Debtor(s)
30
02/16/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk
02/27/2019
Requiring Certification Under 5005(b)(2) (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
02/27/2019
Notice To File Proofs of Claim
34
03/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.