Adam James Bader
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-03709 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/04/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Adam James Bader
15
06/20/2018
Motion to Dismiss Case
16
07/10/2018
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
17
07/13/2018
Order Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Case
18
07/16/2018
Certificate Of Service
19
08/14/2018
TRUSTEE - Final Report and Account - Chapter 13 (not for conversions, supplemental) (batch)
09/14/2018
Virtual Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee, Cancel Bond, Close Estate (Dismissed 12 or 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.