Adam James Forquer and Kimberly Ann Forquer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Iowa (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00117 (iasb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Certificate Of Service
doc
05/22/2018
Certificate Of Service
1
01/20/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Adam James Forquer and Kimberly ann Forquer
doc
05/23/2018
Certificate Of Service
36
07/23/2018
Trustee's Final Report (TFR)
39
10/03/2018
Notice and Report of Abandonment of Property
40
10/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
10/23/2018
Notice and Report of Abandonment of Property - Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
12/03/2018
Trustee's Final Account and Distribution Report Certification (TDR) (batch)
01/02/2019
Final Decree-Chapter 7 (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/02/2019
Close Case - Bankruptcy (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.