Adina Rose Johnson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00041 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/04/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
02/04/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/04/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
02/05/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
02/05/2019
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/07/2019
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
02/08/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
12
02/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
13
02/14/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
14
02/14/2019
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
15
02/14/2019
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
16
02/14/2019
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
17
02/14/2019
Affidavit of Service
02/15/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
02/26/2019
Voluntary Conversion From Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Fee)
19
02/26/2019
BR1019 Report of Post Petition Debts
20
02/26/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
21
02/26/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
22
02/26/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
02/26/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
02/28/2019
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
03/06/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/06/2019
Converting Case To Chapter 7 (BKCONV01-COAfter) (SA)
03/07/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
03/07/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
26
03/07/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
27
03/07/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
28
03/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
29
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
30
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
31
03/09/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
32
03/18/2019
Change of Address
03/18/2019
Update Debtor Information (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
03/20/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.