Adrian Lopez and Patricia Lopez
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California (Bankruptcy)

6:2018-bk-12819 (cacb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/24/2018
Setting Property Value (motion)
05/25/2018
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/05/2018
Hearing Set(Motion) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Notice of motion/application
06/07/2018
Hearing Continued (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Auto VAN-105) (BNC) (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
Hearing Held (Motion) (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
06/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/19/2018
Hearing Continued (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
08/01/2018
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
08/02/2018
Hearing Held (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
08/09/2018
Notice of Lodgment of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Auto)
29
08/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
30
08/17/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BNC-PDF)
31
08/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
33
08/24/2018
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
34
08/31/2018
Stipulation (motion)
09/17/2018
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
Hearing Set(Motion) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.