Adrian Louis Durham and Suzanne Helen Durham
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Kentucky (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-33014 (kywb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing
05/22/2018
Remanding from the Docket-Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/25/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request
35
06/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request
36
07/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
39
08/28/2018
Amend Order of Confirmation
44
11/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Assignment of Claim

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.