Adrian Louise Montgomery
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

6:2018-bk-03707 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
06/20/2018
Statement of Social Security Numbers (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
06/20/2018
Certificate Of Credit Counseling
4
06/21/2018
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset
06/21/2018
(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
06/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
07/27/2018
Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds (No Paper) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/26/2018
Discharge Of Debtor - Ch. 7 - TAMPA/ORLANDO/JAX
8
09/26/2018
Order Approving Account, Discharging Trustee, Canceling Bond & Closing Estate (incl. Conditional)
09/26/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.