Adriane Averette
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2018-bk-00488 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 104 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/07/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Adriane Averette
2
02/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Adriane Averette.
3
02/07/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Adriane Averette
5
02/07/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Adriane Averette.
6
02/07/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Adriane Averette.
7
02/07/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Adriane Averette.
8
02/07/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/14/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/18/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/06/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 05/14/2018.
9
02/08/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
02/08/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Adriane Averette Case Number 10-01955, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/26/2010, Standard Discharge on 09/03/2010.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
02/08/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing or Incorrect Event: PROBLEM: The filer, Brent Davis, Debtor's Attorney, has filed a Chapter 13 Plan that the Attorney did not sign. SOLUTION: The filer, Brent Davis, Debtor's Attorney, should refile as amended with the Attorney's signature. If the filer does not complete the SOLUTION within two business days of this Notice, the Court may deny the requested relief, or the Clerk's Office may take no further action. (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Adriane Averette).
11
02/08/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Adriane Averette).
12
02/08/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
13
02/09/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Planwith attorney signature. Filed by Debtor Adriane Averette (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Adriane Averette.).
14
02/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 02/09/2018.
15
02/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 02/10/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.