Adu et al v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00044 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
11
05/29/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
12
05/29/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
13
05/30/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
14
06/12/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
15
06/14/2018
Scheduling Order
16
06/22/2018
Notice (Other)
17
10/19/2018
Notice of Appearance
18
02/05/2019
Stipulation
19
02/06/2019
Order on Stipulation
20
02/06/2019
Notice (Other)
21
04/01/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
22
04/04/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.