Aguilar v. Van Eaton Ready Mix Inc
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Oklahoma

5:2018-cv-00198 (okwd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
05/29/2018
Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
23
05/31/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
24
06/01/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
25
06/05/2018
Summary Judgment
26
06/05/2018
Scheduling Order
27
06/07/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
28
06/08/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
29
06/19/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.