Aguilera v. Ducart et al
Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of California

4:2018-cv-03389 (cand)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
20
12/10/2018
Opposition/Response to Motion
21
12/10/2018
Re-notice motion
22
12/10/2018
Extension of Time to File Document PSP
23
12/19/2018
24
01/02/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PSP
25
01/02/2019
Opposition/Response to Motion
26
01/25/2019
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 24 SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME.Responses due by 2/8/2019 and Replies due by 2/22/2019.
27
01/25/2019
Certificate/Proof of Service
28
01/25/2019
Certificate/Proof of Service
29
01/25/2019
Opposition/Response to Motion
30
01/31/2019
Reply to Opposition/Response
31
03/08/2019
Extension of Time to File Document PSP
32
03/12/2019
Opposition/Response to Motion
03/13/2019
Electronic Filing Error (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
03/20/2019
34
04/23/2019
Opposition/Response to Motion
35
05/01/2019
Reply to Opposition/Response
36
05/20/2019
Notice of Change In Counsel

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.