Aileen Marie Angeles
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00104 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/04/2018
Certificate of No Objection
doc
06/04/2018
Certificate of Service
24
07/05/2018
Relief from Stay
25
07/06/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
26
07/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
27
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
07/09/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.