Alan H. Beasley
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00438 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/28/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
12/28/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
12/28/2018
Creditor Matrix (Only Use When PDF Image Omitted From Petition - Not An Amended Matrix)
12/28/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/28/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
12/28/2018
Notice of Deficiency of Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix
4
12/29/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
5
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12/31/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
01/02/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
01/02/2019
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
11
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
13
01/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
01/08/2019
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
01/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/11/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
01/11/2019
Credit Counseling Deficiency to Chambers (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/11/2019
Schedules A-J
17
01/11/2019
Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix
18
01/11/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
19
01/11/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
20
01/11/2019
Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )
21
01/11/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
22
01/11/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
01/14/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
01/15/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
24
01/16/2019
Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)
25
01/18/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
01/27/2019
Amended Voluntary Petition
27
01/28/2019
Affidavit
28
01/29/2019
Affidavit
29
02/01/2019
Proceeding Memo
30
02/01/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
31
02/04/2019
Order (Generic) (SA)
02/04/2019
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
02/12/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
33
02/12/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate
03/08/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/08/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.