Alaska Dispatch News, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00285 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Appeal - Clerks Certificate of Readiness to the BAP or USDC (BKA11)
05/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/01/2018
Certificate of Service
doc
06/01/2018
Certificate of No Objection
doc
06/04/2018
Order (Generic) (SA)
234
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
06/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
235
06/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
236
06/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
237
07/24/2018
Appeal - Order From Appellate Court Re: Disposition of Appeal
08/16/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
238
09/17/2018
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
09/17/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
239
09/17/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
09/19/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
240
09/19/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
09/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
241
10/02/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019 (Re Estate - By Trustee or DIP Only) (CM36)
242
10/02/2018
Exhibit To
243
10/02/2018
Declaration
244
10/02/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
245
10/02/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
246
10/02/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
10/03/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
247
10/03/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
248
10/08/2018
Hearing
249
10/08/2018
Certificate of Service
250
10/08/2018
Certificate of Service
10/09/2018
QC Remark Re: Official Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
251
10/09/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
252
10/09/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
253
10/10/2018
Certificate of Service
254
10/10/2018
Certificate of Service
255
10/12/2018
Memorandum in Support
256
10/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
257
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
258
10/18/2018
Relief from Stay
259
10/19/2018
Administrative Expenses
260
10/19/2018
Declaration
261
10/23/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
262
10/23/2018
Certificate of Service
10/29/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
263
11/06/2018
Certificate of No Objection
264
11/06/2018
Certificate of No Objection
265
11/08/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
266
11/08/2018
Hearing
267
11/12/2018
Employ (CM41)
11/14/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
268
11/15/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
269
11/15/2018
Employ
270
11/20/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019
271
11/27/2018
Hearing
272
11/27/2018
Certificate of Service
273
12/12/2018
Approve Settlement / Compromise Under Rule 9019
274
12/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
275
12/14/2018
Compensation
276
12/14/2018
Order on Application to Employ Nunc Pro Tunc
277
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.