Alaska Fishing Adventure LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-00327 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
06/04/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
06/07/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
77
06/19/2018
Hearing
78
07/16/2018
Support Documentation
79
07/19/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
80
07/20/2018
Proceeding Memo
81
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
82
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
83
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
84
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
85
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
86
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
87
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
88
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
89
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
90
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
91
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
92
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
93
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
94
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
95
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
96
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
97
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
98
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
99
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
100
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
101
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
102
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
103
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
104
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
105
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
106
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
107
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
108
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
109
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
110
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
111
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
112
07/25/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
07/26/2018
QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image (Text entry; no document attached.)
113
07/26/2018
Corrective Entry (File Correct Image ONLY - No Changes to Document)
114
08/24/2018
Stipulation on Proof of Claim
115
08/24/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
116
08/28/2018
Proceeding Memo
117
08/28/2018
Withdrawal of Claim
118
08/28/2018
Memorandum in Support
119
08/28/2018
Claims (SA)
120
08/29/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
08/30/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
121
08/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
122
08/31/2018
Proceeding Memo
123
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
124
09/04/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
131
09/24/2018
Employ
132
09/26/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
133
09/26/2018
Certificate of Service of Prompt Determination of Tax Liability
134
10/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
135
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
136
10/24/2018
Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)
137
10/26/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
138
10/26/2018
Memorandum in Support
139
10/26/2018
Affidavit
140
11/02/2018
Support Documentation
141
11/05/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
142
11/06/2018
Affidavit
143
11/08/2018
Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)
144
11/09/2018
Memorandum in Support
145
11/29/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
146
11/29/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
147
11/29/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
148
12/11/2018
Memorandum Decision (SA)
149
12/11/2018
Sell Property (Under Sec 363(b))
150
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
151
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.