Alaska Laborers Employers Retirement Trust et al v. Miller Construction Company, Ltd. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00069 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
8
06/29/2018
Order
9
07/26/2018
Notice (Other)
07/27/2018
Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
08/10/2018
Answer to Complaint
12
08/15/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
13
09/12/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
09/13/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
09/26/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
16
11/06/2018
Scheduling Order
17
01/09/2019
Stipulation of Dismissal

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.