Alaska Pretrial Detainees for the End of Unwarranted Courtroom Shackling et al v. Johnson et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00226 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
52
05/09/2018
ORDER: re Motion for Preliminary Injunction 10 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 05/09/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
55
05/25/2018
Dismiss
56
05/30/2018
Appeal Transcript (USDCA 435) Request
57
05/30/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
58
05/31/2018
Transcript
59
06/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
60
07/06/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss
61
08/08/2018
Stay
62
08/10/2018
Order on Motion to Stay
63
12/17/2018
USCA Order
64
01/04/2019
USCA Mandate
65
01/04/2019
Order
66
01/04/2019
Status Report
67
01/17/2019
Notice of Appearance
68
01/18/2019
Status Report
69
01/23/2019
Order
70
01/23/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.