Alecia Bahna
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00324 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 248 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/26/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Alecia Bahna
3
01/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Alecia Bahna.
4
01/26/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Alecia Bahna.
01/26/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-00324-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21651206. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
01/26/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/05/2018 at 02:30 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 05/04/2018.
6
01/27/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
7
01/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 01/28/2018.
01/29/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Alecia Bahna Case Number 17-02023, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 05/09/2017, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 10/30/2017.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
01/29/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 1/29/2018.
9
01/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/31/2018.
10
02/02/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jonathan Mancil Smothers Filed by Creditor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
03/07/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Thomas E Reynolds, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 175740.00, Assets Exempt: $ 6885.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 280886.22, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 280886.22. Debtor appeared. (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
05/02/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, or in the alternative Motion for Adequate Protection Filed by Creditor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc
12
05/02/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc (RE: related document(s) 11 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Adequate Protection).
05/02/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(18-00324-DSC7) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22023478. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 11) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
05/02/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (RE: related document(s) 11 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc, Motion for Adequate Protection). Hearing scheduled 5/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
15
05/04/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 13 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 05/04/2018.
16
05/09/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management for Debtor. Financial Management Course due:6/8/2018.
17
05/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/11/2018.
18
05/17/2018
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay Without Objection (Related Doc # 11), Signed on 5/17/2018.
19
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 18 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 05/19/2018.
20
06/19/2018
Case closed without discharge for non-compliance. Debtor has not filed required certification documents. If the Debtor subsequently files a Motion to Reopen the Case to allow for the filing of the certification documents, the full reopening fee must be paid for filing the motion and the fee cannot be waived.
21
06/19/2018
Order Discharging Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case. The estate of the above named Debtor having been fully administered, it is ORDERED that: The accounts and report of the Trustee are hereby filed; the Trustee be and is hereby discharged as trustee of the estate of the above named debtor and the bond is cancelled; and the Chapter 7 case of the above named Debtor is closed. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry)
22
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Case Closed Without Discharge). Notice Date 06/21/2018.
23
08/10/2018
Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Submit Cert of Instructional Course for Personal Financial Mgmt. Fee Amount $260 Filed by Debtor Alecia Bahna
08/10/2018
Receipt of Motion to Reopen Case(18-00324-DSC7) [motion,mreopall] (260.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22385352. Fee Amount 260.00 (re:Doc# 23) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
08/13/2018
Order Granting Motion To Reopen Case (Related Doc # 23) (No Trustee) Signed on 8/13/2018.
25
08/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 24 Order on Motion to Reopen Case). Notice Date 08/15/2018.
26
10/14/2018
Certificate of Financial Management Course
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.