Alesa Birgans
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-81988 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
07/07/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
14
08/24/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
15
09/03/2018
Notice of Withdrawal
29
12/31/2018
Modify Plan
30
12/31/2018
Amended Schedules (Fee)
32
01/28/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.