Aleutian Spray LLC v. Courage
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00288 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/14/2018
Complaint
2
12/14/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/14/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
4
12/14/2018
Notice (Other)
12/14/2018
Filing Fee Received (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/14/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
6
12/14/2018
Declaration
7
01/03/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
8
02/06/2019
Notice (Other)
9
03/22/2019
Entry of Default
10
03/22/2019
Declaration
11
03/22/2019
Declaration
04/02/2019
Docket Annotation re Combined Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
04/02/2019
Clerks Entry of Default
13
04/02/2019
Default Judgment
14
05/10/2019
Judgment - Default

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.