Alexander Edward Burgholzer-Schwochert
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00243 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/30/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
07/30/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
07/30/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
07/31/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
8
08/01/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
9
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
10
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
12
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
08/16/2018
Request for Special Notice
14
08/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
15
08/24/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
16
08/24/2018
Certificate of Service
09/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
09/20/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
18
09/26/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
19
10/03/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
20
10/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
21
10/03/2018
Proceeding Memo
22
10/03/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)
23
10/09/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
24
10/10/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
25
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
10/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
10/14/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.