Alexander Mataifale Toeaina and Fiaau Lagi Toeaina
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of California (Bankruptcy)

4:2016-bk-43440 (canb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/15/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Alexander Mataifale Toeaina and Fiaau Lagi Toeaina
80
10/07/2018
Modify Plan
81
10/07/2018
Declaration
82
10/07/2018
Modify Plan
94
12/10/2018
Notice of Hearing
95
01/15/2019
audio
01/16/2019
Hearing Held (Adv) (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
01/17/2019
Dismiss Case
98
01/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Dismissal
99
01/19/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
101
02/21/2019
Discharging Chapter 12/13 Trustee After Case Dismissal and Final Decree
02/22/2019
Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
102
02/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.