Alexander Michael Stauffer and Caryn Heather Stauffer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Texas (Bankruptcy)

4:2014-bk-36150 (txsb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
123
06/14/2018
Uniform Modification of Confirmed Plan (Chapter 13)
128
06/28/2018
Withdraw Document
129
06/28/2018
Modification Recommendation
130
06/28/2018
Proposed Order
133
07/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
07/06/2018
Motion terminated (Text entry; no document attached.)
135
07/06/2018
Courtroom Minutes/Order - M5 JB - M2 MI DJ ER JN
138
03/11/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.