Alexander Molina, Jr.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-18354 (cacb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/20/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
2
07/20/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Per Part 5 of Voluntary Petition)
07/20/2018
Statement About Your Social Security Number (Official Form 121) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/20/2018
Declaration by Debtor as to Whether Db Received Income From an Employer (LBR Form F1002-1)
5
07/20/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (I/J No POC)
6
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/23/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
08/02/2018
Request for special notice
9
09/27/2018
Notice of Change of Address (multi)
10
10/29/2018
ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 7 (CACB AutoDischarge) (BNC)
10/30/2018
Close Bankruptcy Case (CACB AutoClose) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
10/31/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.