Alexander Nathan Ziegler
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Colorado (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-18178 (cob)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/18/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Alexander Nathan Ziegler
19
12/13/2018
Chapter 13 Notice of Financial Management and/or Domestic Support Obligation Certificate
20
12/13/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
21
12/13/2018
3015 Notice
22
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
23
12/31/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
26
01/11/2019
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan
27
01/13/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing
33
02/22/2019
Verification of Confirmable Plan
34
02/25/2019
Virtual Order: Confirming Amended Chapter 13 Plan
04/29/2019
Trustee's Claim Recommendations (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.