Alexander Ortolano
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Washington (Bankruptcy)

2:2016-bk-00843 (waeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/17/2016
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Alexander Ortolano
98
08/23/2018
Amended Schedules (May include Summary of Schedules)
99
08/23/2018
Declaration (use this event for declarations, affidavits and sworn statements)
102
09/21/2018
Objection to Exemptions
103
09/21/2018
Certificate of Service
104
09/24/2018
Notice of Appearance
105
09/24/2018
Objection to Exemptions
106
09/24/2018
Declaration (use this event for declarations, affidavits and sworn statements)
107
11/13/2018
Notice (use only if other events don't apply)
109
12/19/2018
Complaint
110
01/08/2019
Certificate of Service
01/08/2019
Declaration of No Objections (text only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
112
01/09/2019
Amended (for Amended Events other than what MAY be listed below)
113
01/09/2019
Notice of Hearing
01/24/2019
Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
115
01/25/2019
Stipulation - ONLY use if no Order is needed
116
04/26/2019
Ch 7 Trustee Interim Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.