Allen Dene Smith and D'Anna Lynn Smith
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-00164 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
doc
05/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/30/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
doc
05/30/2018
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
05/30/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/31/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
doc
05/31/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
05/31/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
doc
06/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
06/04/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
06/04/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
06/04/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
14
06/06/2018
Change of Address
15
06/06/2018
Certificate of Service
06/07/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
06/21/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
17
06/21/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
06/21/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
06/22/2018
Change of Address
19
06/22/2018
Certificate of Service
06/22/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/25/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/11/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
07/11/2018
Notice of Asset Determination (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
07/11/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
22
07/11/2018
Employ (CM41)
23
07/11/2018
Declaration
24
07/12/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim (BNC Notice)
25
07/12/2018
Employ
26
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice to File Proof of Claim
27
07/16/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
28
07/16/2018
Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Chambers Template-BNC Notice)
29
07/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
30
07/30/2018
Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)
31
07/30/2018
Certificate of Service
07/31/2018
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Update Matrix (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
08/01/2018
Proceeding Memo
08/02/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
08/03/2018
Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAfter) (SA)
08/03/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
08/03/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
35
08/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
36
08/20/2018
Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)
37
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
38
08/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
39
08/23/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
40
08/23/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
08/27/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
08/27/2018
Notice of Deferral of Discharge (Reaffs Not Filed) (BNC Notice)
42
08/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
43
09/11/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
44
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.