Allen v. Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama

3:2014-cv-00706 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 663 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/25/2014
COMPLAINT against Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, Star Paschal (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602032970.), filed by Charisse Allen. (Attachment(s) added on 7/29/2014, omitted when originally docketed: # 1 Filing Fee Receipt).
2
07/25/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Charisse Allen.
07/25/2014
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Charisse Allen. (This document has no pdf attached, see Doc. 1 for pdf.) (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/29/2014
Summons Issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, and Star Paschal.
4
08/01/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by B. Morgan for Star Paschal served on 7/30/2014, answer due 8/20/2014.
5
08/01/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by B. Morgan for Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama served on 7/30/2014, answer due 8/20/2014.
6
08/13/2014
Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by B. Morgan for Lee Eastman served on 7/30/2014, answer due 8/20/2014.
7
08/20/2014
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, Star Paschal.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
08/20/2014
***Attorney Jonathan Corley Hill added for Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, and Star Paschal. (see Doc. 7 for pdf) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/21/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama.
9
08/21/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lee Eastman.
10
08/21/2014
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Star Paschal.
11
08/21/2014
Case reassigned to Chief Judge William Keith Watkins. Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge.
12
09/05/2014
BRIEFING ORDER re Defendants' 7 Motion to Dismiss. Motion Submission Deadline set for 10/3/2014 without oral argument. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff file a response, which shall include a brief, on or before 9/26/2014. The defendants may file a reply brief on or before 10/3/2014. ORDER setting out briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/5/2014.
13
09/10/2014
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charisse Allen.
14
09/23/2014
ORDER that the Defendants' 7 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot based upon the filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants are DIRECTED to file an answer or other response to the First Amended Complaint within the time frame set out by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/23/2014.
15
09/23/2014
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, Star Paschal.
16
09/24/2014
TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendants' 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED to and including 10/8/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 9/24/2014. (NO PDF attached)
17
10/08/2014
MOTION to Dismiss 13 Amended Complaint by Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, Star Paschal. Modified on 10/9/2014 to create link to Doc. 13.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
18
10/29/2014
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Charisse Allen.
19
10/30/2014
TEXT ORDER that Plaintiff's 18 Unopposed Motion for Five Day Extension is GRANTED to and including 11/3/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 10/30/2014. (NO PDF attached)
20
11/03/2014
RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Charisse Allen.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
21
11/10/2014
REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, Star Paschal.
22
11/26/2014
SUPPLEMENTAL Filing in Support of 20 Opposition to 17 Motion to Dismiss filed by Charisse Allen. Modified on 12/1/2014 to reflect actual title.
1
Exhibit E
1 Attachment
23
12/03/2014
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's 22 Supplemental Filing in Support of Opposition to 17 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, Star Paschal. Modified on 12/4/2014 to reflect actual title and create link to Doc. 17.
24
12/08/2014
REPLY BRIEF re 23 Reply Brief, filed by Charisse Allen.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
25
12/12/2014
MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's 24 Reply Brief by Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, Star Paschal. Modified on 12/15/2014 to create link to Doc. 24.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
26
12/15/2014
TEXT ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Reply Brief. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 12/15/2014. (dmn, (NO PDF attached)
27
12/15/2014
RESPONSE to Plaintiff's 24 Reply Brief re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Lee Eastman, Housing Authority of the City of Auburn, Alabama, Star Paschal. Modified on 12/16/2014 to reflect actual title and to create link to Doc. 24 and.
28
01/02/2015
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting.
29
01/26/2015
MOTION for Order to Set Scheduling Order by Charisse Allen.
30
02/27/2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Doc. # 17) is GRANTED and that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, as further set out. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on February 27, 2015.
31
02/27/2015
FINAL JUDGMENT directing that, in accordance with the prior proceedings, opinions, and orders of the court, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs; the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on February 27, 2015.
1
Civil Appeals Checklist
1 Attachment
32
03/30/2015
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Charisse Allen as to 30 Memorandum Opinion and Order, and 31 Judgment entered on 02/27/2015.
33
03/30/2015
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 4602036196 re 32 Notice of Appeal filed by Charisse Allen.
34
03/30/2015
Appeal Instructions sent to Attorney L. Landis Sexton counsel for Charisse Allen re 32 Notice of Appeal. A copy of the Transcript Information Form must be mailed to each court reporter from whom you are requesting a transcript.
35
03/30/2015
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, 17 MOTION to Dismiss 13 Amended Complaint, 30 Memorandum Opinion and Order, 31 Judgment, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 32 Notice of Appeal.
1
APPEAL PACKAGE
1 Attachment
36
03/31/2015
USCA Case Number 15-11343-A for 32 Notice of Appeal filed by Charisse Allen.
37
04/06/2015
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Charisse Allen
04/06/2015
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: 32 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 15-11343-A. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
11/23/2015
Per Curiam Opinion received from USCA Eleventh Circuit of Opinion Entered on 11/23/2015, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-11343-AA: For the reasons set forth herein, we affirm the district court's dismissal of Allen's FHA claim for failure to comply with the two-year statute of limitations. AFFIRMED. Before ROSENBAUM, JULIE CARNES, and DUBINA, Circuit Judges.
39
12/22/2015
JUDGMENT ISSUED AS MANDATE 12/22/2015 of USCA as to 32 Notice of Appeal filed by Charisse Allen, 11th Circuit Appeal No. 15-11343-AA; For the reasons set forth herein, we affirm the district courts dismissal of Allens FHA claim for failure to comply with the two-year statute of limitations. AFFIRMED. See 38 USCA Per Curiam Opinion entered on 11/23/2015.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.