Allen v. State of Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00234 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
40
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
41
06/20/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
42
06/20/2018
Affidavit
06/22/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
06/27/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
12/17/2018
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
12/19/2018
Docket Annotation re Incorrect PDF Associated (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
12/27/2018
Notice of Appearance
48
12/27/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
49
12/27/2018
Affidavit
50
12/27/2018
Affidavit
12/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
02/01/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
53
03/04/2019
Report and Recommendation - Final
54
03/27/2019
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the record de novo and concurs with the Final Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. The Motion to Dismiss at Docket 39 is GRANTED and Mr. Allens First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254(D) at Docket 28 is DENIED and DISMISSED. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/27/2019.
55
03/27/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.