Allen v. Walmart Stores, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00137 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
06/13/2018
Notice of Removal
2
06/13/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
06/13/2018
Notice of Appearance
4
06/13/2018
Jury Demand
5
06/13/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
6
06/25/2018
Notice of Service List
7
06/25/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
8
07/02/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
9
07/02/2018
Answer to Complaint
10
07/05/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
11
07/27/2018
Notice (Other)
12
08/01/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
13
08/28/2018
Scheduling Order
14
04/05/2019
Summary Judgment
15
04/05/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
16
05/03/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
05/08/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
05/08/2019
Notice (Other)
05/08/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
05/13/2019
Reply to Response to Motion

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.