Alli v. ASRC Energy Services, LLC
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00280 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 5 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/12/2016
COMPLAINT against ASRC Energy Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2252756.), filed by Raymond Alli.
1
Exhibit A - Consent
1 Attachment
2
12/12/2016
Civil Cover Sheet.
3
12/13/2016
Unissued summons re Defendant ASRC Energy Services, LLC
12/13/2016
Summons Issued as to ASRC Energy Services, LLC. (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/15/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney J. Derek Braziel. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2254087.) by Raymond Alli.
1
Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
5
12/15/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney J. Forester. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2254088.) by Raymond Alli.
1
Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
6
12/15/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Travis Gasper. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2254089.) by Raymond Alli.
1
Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
7
12/15/2016
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Jack Siegel. (Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2254114.) by Raymond Alli.
1
Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing
1 Attachment
8
12/15/2016
CLERK'S NOTICE re 4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Derek Braziel, at docket 4, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
9
12/15/2016
CLERK'S NOTICE re 5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Forester, at docket 5, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
10
12/15/2016
CLERK'S NOTICE re 6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Travis Gasper, at docket 6, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
11
12/15/2016
CLERK'S NOTICE re 7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jack Siegel, at docket 7, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
12
12/19/2016
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Alli. ASRC Energy Services, LLC served on 12/14/2016, answer due 1/4/2017.
13
12/22/2016
ORDER re Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 12/22/16.
14
01/17/2017
MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Kent J. Sprinkle by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
1
Certificate of Standing
1 Attachment
15
01/18/2017
Receipt of $150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Kent J. Sprinkle as to defendant ASRC Energy Services Alaska, Inc. re 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney Kent J. Sprinkle
16
01/18/2017
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Class Claims and Motion to Stay Proceedings by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
17
01/18/2017
DECLARATION of DEBBIE NEWSHAM re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Class Claims and Motion to Stay Proceedings by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
18
01/18/2017
DECLARATION of KENT J. SPRINKLE re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Class Claims and Motion to Stay Proceedings by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
1
Exhibit C
2
Exhibit D
2 Attachments
19
01/18/2017
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
20
01/18/2017
NOTICE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by ASRC Energy Services, LLC re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Class Claims and Motion to Stay Proceedings Modified on 2/6/2017 to create relationship to dkt 22.
1
Exhibit E
2
Exhibit F
2 Attachments
21
01/25/2017
CLERK'S NOTICE re 14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kent J. Sprinkle, at docket 14, is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d).
01/26/2017
Docket Annotation : Immediate Action Needed: Your recent electronic filing with the District of Alaska is in error: 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Class Claims and Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by ASRC Energy Services, LLC Combined Documents are not allowed. [SEE D.Ak. L.R. 7.1(l)]. ACTION NEEDED: Attorney to re-file the portion Motion to Stay using the event Motion to Stay (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/27/2017
MOTION to Stay by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
23
01/27/2017
DECLARATION of DEBBIE NEWSHAM re 22 MOTION to Stay by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
2 Attachments
24
01/27/2017
DECLARATION of KENT J. SPRINKLE re 22 MOTION to Stay by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
1
Exhibit C
2
Exhibit D
2 Attachments
25
02/08/2017
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 MOTION to Stay by Raymond Alli.
1
Exhibit Ex. A - Emails
2
Exhibit Ex. B - Proposed Stip.
3
Proposed Order
3 Attachments
26
02/09/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 MOTION to Stay filed by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
27
02/09/2017
DECLARATION of KENT J. SPRINKLE re 26 Response in Opposition to Motion by ASRC Energy Services, LLC. Modified on 2/10/2017 to Create relationship to document #22
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
3 Attachments
28
02/10/2017
MOTION to Strike Motions by Raymond Alli.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
29
02/12/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 MOTION to Stay filed by Raymond Alli.
30
02/13/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Strike Motions filed by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
31
02/13/2017
DECLARATION of KENT J. SPRINKLE re 30 Response in Opposition to Motion by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
32
02/13/2017
AFFIDAVIT of AMY JARRELL re 30 Response in Opposition to Motion by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
33
02/17/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Class Claims and Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Raymond Alli.
34
02/21/2017
RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Class Claims and Motion to Stay Proceedings, 22 MOTION to Stay filed by Raymond Alli.
35
02/24/2017
REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Class Claims and Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
36
02/28/2017
RESPONSE in Support re 22 MOTION to Stay filed by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
37
03/02/2017
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Re Motion to Compel Arbitration by Raymond Alli re 33 Response in Opposition to Motion, 34 Response in Opposition to Motion
1
Exhibit Ex. A - Macias v. Excel Bldg. Servs., LLC
2
Exhibit Ex. B - Sherwood v. Blue Cross
2 Attachments
38
03/02/2017
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Re Motion to Stay by Raymond Alli re 33 Response in Opposition to Motion, 34 Response in Opposition to Motion
1
Exhibit Ex. A - Dang v. Allegis
2
Exhibit Ex. B - Mackall v. Healthsource
3
Exhibit Ex. C - Thoma v. CBRE
4
Exhibit Ex. D - Coppernoll v. Hamcor, Inc.
4 Attachments
39
03/03/2017
NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER SURREPLY [ECF 37] RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by ASRC Energy Services, LLC re 37 Notice (Other)
40
03/07/2017
NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S IMPROPER SURREPLY [ECF 38] RE MOTION TO STAY by ASRC Energy Services, LLC re 38 Notice (Other)
41
05/08/2017
ORDER: Alli's Motion for Extension of Time at docket 25 is GRANTED, and responses at dockets 33 and 34 are deemed timely. Alli's Motion to Strike Motions at docket 28 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 5/8/2017. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
42
09/29/2017
ORDER: The Motion to Stay at docket 22 is GRANTED IN PART with respect to all collective and class action allegations, and the Motion to Compel at docket 16 is STAYED pending the outcome of the Supreme Court's decision in Morris v. Ernst & Young. Alli may proceed with discovery in his individual claims. Within seven (7) days of the Supreme Court's decision in Morris, the parties must file a joint status report informing the Court how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/29/2017. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
05/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
05/25/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER RE 42. On May 21, 2018, the Supreme Court issued an opinion in Ernst & Young LLP, et al. v. Stephen Morris, et al. (together with Epic Systems Corp. v. Lewis and NLRB v. Murphy Oil USA, Inc., et al.). Pursuant to the order at docket 42, the parties are directed to file a status update by May 29, 2018. (JDS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
44
05/29/2018
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by ASRC Energy Services, LLC.
45
09/04/2018
ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/4/2018. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF).
09/10/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
09/10/2018
TMB TEXT ORDER: In light of the Court's order at docket 45 granting Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, this case is dismissed.
47
09/13/2018
JUDGMENT case is dismissed. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 9/13/18.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.