Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE a/s/o Perrigo Company et al v. Victory Logistics, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of Illinois

1:2018-cv-01267 (ilcd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/20/2018
2
07/23/2018
Summons Issued
3
08/22/2018
Affidavit of Service
4
08/22/2018
Affidavit of Service
5
08/22/2018
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
6
08/24/2018
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
7
08/29/2018
Crossclaim
8
08/29/2018
Summons Issued
9
09/10/2018
Certificate of Interest
10
10/03/2018
Summons Returned Unexecuted
11
10/25/2018
Affidavit of Service
12
10/25/2018
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
13
10/25/2018
Leave to File Document
14
10/25/2018
Certificate of Service/Counsel
10/26/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
11/08/2018
Answer to Complaint
16
11/08/2018
Crossclaim
17
11/08/2018
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
18
11/08/2018
Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Rule 16)
19
11/13/2018
Certificate of Interest
20
11/28/2018
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
21
11/29/2018
Leave to File Document
22
11/30/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
23
11/30/2018
Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition
12/03/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
12/05/2018
Dismiss
25
12/05/2018
Memorandum in Support of Motion/Petition
26
12/11/2018
Discovery Plan - Proposed/Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
27
12/12/2018
Order
28
12/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
12/14/2018
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16
30
12/14/2018
Response to Motion/Petition
31
12/14/2018
Response to Motion/Petition
32
12/20/2018
ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 12/20/2018. IT IS ORDERED: Gully Transportation Co.'s Motion for Relief from Judgment Pursuant to Rule 60(b) 22 is GRANTED and its Motion to Dismiss Victory Logistics, LLC's Crossclaim 24 is DENIED. The Court ORDERS its Order on November 28, 2018 20 is modified such that the dismissal of Gully Transportation's crossclaim is without prejudice rather than with prejudice. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER & OPINION.
33
01/11/2019
Leave to File Document
01/14/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
01/14/2019
Answer to Crossclaim
35
01/14/2019
Certificate of Service/Counsel
36
01/24/2019
Auto docketing digital audio upload
37
01/25/2019
Certificate of Service/Counsel
38
01/25/2019
Certificate of Service/Counsel
39
03/04/2019
Certificate of Service/Counsel
40
03/20/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
03/21/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/22/2019
Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.