Allicia Ann Tucker
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Tennessee (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-12956 (tneb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/05/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
07/05/2018
SSN Certification (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
07/05/2018
Pay Filing Fee in Installments
4
07/05/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
5
07/05/2018
Statement of Intent
6
07/05/2018
Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)
7
07/05/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling For Debtor(s)
8
07/05/2018
Statement Regarding Payment Advices
07/05/2018
Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
07/06/2018
Pay Filing Fees in Installments
12
07/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
13
07/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
07/09/2018
Installment Payment (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
07/12/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
17
07/30/2018
Financial Management Course
18
07/30/2018
Financial Management Course (ADI)
08/01/2018
Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Installment Payment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Final Installment Payment (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
08/17/2018
Agreed Order
24
08/21/2018
Agreed Order
25
08/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
08/29/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
10/04/2018
Discharging Debtor(s)
28
10/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
29
10/31/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
11/02/2018
Returned Paper Mail (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Case Closed (BK) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.