Allicia Higgins
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Missouri (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-47470 (moeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
12
12/24/2018
Amended Schedules
13
12/30/2018
Personal Financial Management Course
14
01/02/2019
Financial Management Course
15
01/04/2019
Financial Management Course
16
01/08/2019
Withdraw Document
17
01/15/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
20
02/20/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
21
03/05/2019
Transfer of Claim
03/05/2019
none (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
03/19/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.