Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc. v. Allied Home Inspections FL, LLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida

5:2018-cv-00372 (flmd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
07/16/2018
Order on motion to transfer case
07/20/2018
Division transfer in (Text entry; no document attached.)
11
08/09/2018
Answer to Complaint
12
08/21/2018
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
13
08/22/2018
Certificate of compliance
14
08/28/2018
Default
15
09/13/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
16
09/14/2018
Case Management Report
17
10/17/2018
Clerks default
18
10/22/2018
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
19
10/23/2018
Clerks Entry of Default
20
02/11/2019
Case management and scheduling order
21
02/11/2019
Order to show cause
22
02/25/2019
Response to order to show cause
23
02/28/2019
Summary judgment
24
03/05/2019
Notice (Other)
25
03/18/2019
Order to show cause
26
03/22/2019
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
03/22/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.