Allied Building Products LLC d/b/a AMS v. John Jory Corporation d/b/a Jory Corp. et al
Court Docket Sheet

Central District of California

8:2018-cv-02204 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
2
12/12/2018
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
8
12/14/2018
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
12
12/17/2018
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
19
01/14/2019
Order
20
01/14/2019
Memorandum in Support of Motion
21
01/14/2019
Declaration (Motion related)
22
01/14/2019
Declaration (Motion related)
23
01/14/2019
Declaration (Motion related)
25
01/23/2019
Clerk to Enter Default
26
01/23/2019
Declaration (Motion related)
27
01/24/2019
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
29
01/28/2019
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
30
01/31/2019
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
33
02/07/2019
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
35
02/14/2019
Reply (Motion related)
36
02/14/2019
Declaration
37
02/21/2019
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
38
02/25/2019
Supplement (Motion related)
39
02/25/2019
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
40
02/26/2019
Declaration
41
02/26/2019
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
03/04/2019
Scheduling Conference - optional html form (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
03/07/2019
Miscellaneous Document
45
03/12/2019
Scheduling Conference - optional html form

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.