Allied Consolidated Industries, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Ohio (Bankruptcy)

4:2016-bk-40675 (ohnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Order (PDF)
1
04/13/2016
Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Petition of Allied Consolidated Industries, Inc.
doc
05/25/2018
Notice of Order (PDF)
565
09/18/2018
Exhibit/Witness List
605
12/18/2018
Order (PDF)
612
01/14/2019
Notice of Opinion and Order
623
02/05/2019
Status Report
632
03/17/2019
Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)
633
03/17/2019
Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF)
04/01/2019
ADI Returned Mail (Text entry; no document attached.)
638
04/05/2019
Status Report
642
04/29/2019
Continue Hearing
643
04/29/2019
Order (PDF)
04/29/2019
Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
645
05/02/2019
Notice of Order (PDF)
646
05/02/2019
Extend Time
647
05/02/2019
Order (PDF)
648
05/03/2019
Order (PDF)
657
05/20/2019
Statement of Issues on Appeal
658
05/20/2019
Set Hearing (PDF)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.