Allied Esquire Group, Inc. v. Byrd & Associates, PLLC et al
Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Mississippi

2:2010-cv-00197 (mssd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
58
08/25/2011
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. A separate Judgment shall be entered pursuant to Rule 58(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on August 25, 2011
62
06/13/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
63
06/13/2018
Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY
64
06/15/2018
ORDER granting 62 Motion to Renew Judgment. The Clerk is directed to accept the Notice of Renewal of Judgment for filing and to mail notice of the filing to judgment debtors Byrd & Associates, PLLC and Isaac K Byrd and to make note of the mailing in the docket. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 6/15/18
06/18/2018
Remark (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.