Allstate Insurance Company v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00173 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/25/2018
Notice of Removal
2
07/25/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
07/25/2018
Jury Demand
4
07/25/2018
Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal
5
07/26/2018
Notice of Service List
6
07/26/2018
Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)
7
07/31/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
8
08/02/2018
Order
9
08/16/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
10
08/20/2018
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
11
08/20/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
12
09/04/2018
Answer to Complaint
13
09/10/2018
Scheduling Order
14
09/24/2018
Summary Judgment
15
09/24/2018
Memorandum
16
10/05/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
17
10/05/2018
Summary Judgment
18
10/05/2018
Memorandum
19
10/18/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
20
11/01/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
21
11/05/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
22
11/05/2018
Order
23
11/27/2018
Witness List
24
11/27/2018
Witness List
12/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.