Als Scan, Inc. v. Cloudflare, Inc. et al
Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-cv-05051 (cacd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 150 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/11/2016
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18160378 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2) (Attorney Jay M Spillane added to party ALS Scan, Inc.(pty:pla)
2 Attachments
2
07/11/2016
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
3
07/11/2016
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
4
07/11/2016
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
5
07/12/2016
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
6
07/12/2016
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
7
07/12/2016
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Cloudflare, Inc., Tiger Media, Inc., and Gerardus Van Ginneken. (jtil)
8
07/21/2016
STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU: (See order for details).
9
07/25/2016
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/8/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
10
07/25/2016
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
11
07/25/2016
DECLARATION of Sarah Walsh in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
12
07/25/2016
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
23
Exhibit 23
24
Exhibit 24
25
Exhibit 25
26
Exhibit 26
27
Exhibit 27
28
Exhibit 28
29
Exhibit 29
30
Exhibit 30
30 Attachments
13
07/25/2016
DECLARATION of Steve Easton in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
16 Attachments
14
07/25/2016
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
6 Attachments
15
07/25/2016
NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. of disc of Easton emails.
16
07/25/2016
Corrected NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. of disc of Easton emails.
17
08/05/2016
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gary L Bostwick on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Attorney Gary L Bostwick added to party Tiger Media, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gary L Bostwick added to party Gerardus Van Ginneken(pty:dft))
18
08/08/2016
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence G. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18330875) filed by defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken.
1
Proposed Order re PHV admission of L. Walters
1 Attachment
19
08/08/2016
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin S. Toll to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18330922) filed by defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerard us Van Ginneken.
1
Declaration of Good Standing
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
20
08/09/2016
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence G. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18330875) 18, APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin S. Toll to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18330922) 19. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed.
21
08/10/2016
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence G. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 8/8/2016, Receipt No. 25T7LCL1) filed by defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken.
22
08/10/2016
Corrected APPLICATION to CORRECT APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence G. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18330875) 18 filed by defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken.
23
08/10/2016
Corrected APPLICATION to CORRECT APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin S. Toll to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18330922) 19 filed by defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken.
24
08/10/2016
Corrected APPLICATION to CORRECT Corrected APPLICATION to CORRECT APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence G. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18330875) 18 22 filed by defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken.
25
08/10/2016
STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
26
08/10/2016
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence G. Walters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 8/8/2016, Receipt No. 25T7LCL1) 21. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed.
27
08/10/2016
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 19, 23 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin S. Toll APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant, TIGER MEDIA, INC. & GERARDUS VAN GINNEKEN, designating Gary L. Bostwick as local counsel. (mrgo)
28
08/10/2016
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 18, 21 Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence G. Walters APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant TIGER MEDIA, INC. & GERARDUS VAN GINNEKEN, designating Gary L. Bostwick as local counsel. (mrgo)
29
08/12/2016
ORDER RE STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. AND DEFENDANTS TIGER MEDIA, INC. AND GERARDUS VAN GINNEKEN RE JURISDICTION, DISMISSAL AND CERTAIN MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media Motion 9, and Stipulation for Hearing 25. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2016., Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 9/5/2016.) (Motion for Preliminary Injunction continued to 10/3/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
30
08/16/2016
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Corey D. Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18379015) filed by defendants Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
31
08/17/2016
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge George H. Wu: granting 30 Non-Resident Attorney Corey D. Silverstein APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken, designating Gary L Bostwick as local counsel.
32
08/18/2016
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Gerardus Van Ginneken.
33
08/26/2016
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1, filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
34
09/05/2016
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc., identifying Gerardus Van Ginneken.
35
09/05/2016
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on which Relief can be Granted filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/3/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim
1 Attachment
36
09/05/2016
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on which Relief can be Granted 35 filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.
1
Exhibit A - JuicyAds Terms of Service
1 Attachment
37
09/05/2016
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rachel H Kassabian on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Rachel H Kassabian added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))
38
09/05/2016
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carolyn M Homer on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Carolyn M Homer added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))
39
09/05/2016
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cloudflare, Inc. answer now due 9/26/2016, re Amended Complaint/Petition 33 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
40
09/06/2016
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR CLOUDFLARE'S RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu: CloudFlare shall have until September 26, 2016 to file a response to ALS Scan's First Amended Complaint.
41
09/12/2016
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.
1
Declaration of Gerardus Van Ginneken
1 Attachment
42
09/12/2016
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), 13, Declaration (Motion related), 12, Declaration (Motion related) 11 filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.
43
09/12/2016
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on which Relief can be Granted 35 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
44
09/19/2016
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
45
09/19/2016
DECLARATION of Eric Penn reply in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Against Tiger Media. Motion 9 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 31
2
Exhibit 32
3
Exhibit 33
3 Attachments
46
09/19/2016
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on which Relief can be Granted 35 filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.
47
09/23/2016
OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), 45 filed by Defendant Tiger Media, Inc.
48
09/26/2016
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
49
09/26/2016
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/24/2016 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
50
09/26/2016
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) 49 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
51
10/03/2016
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) 49 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
52
10/03/2016
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) 49 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
6 Attachments
53
10/03/2016
MINUTES OF MOTION BY PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT TIGER MEDIA, INC. 9 ; DEFENDANT TIGER MEDIA INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 35 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Based on the Tentative, and for reasons stated on the record, Defendant Tiger's motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief is MOOT. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
54
10/04/2016
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hivelocity Ventures Corporation answer now due 10/18/2016, re Amended Complaint/Petition 33 filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
1
Proposed Order)(Attorney John Lewis Holcomb, Jr added to party Hivelocity Ventures Corporation(pty:dft)
1 Attachment
55
10/10/2016
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) 49 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
56
10/18/2016
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 33 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
57
10/19/2016
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 56. The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so.
58
10/20/2016
(IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: On the Court's own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for November 28, 2016, at 8:30 AM Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than November 14, 2016. See Local Rule 26-1. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to all parties that have appeared in this action, and is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date.
59
10/24/2016
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B)(6) 49 held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears oral argument. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Defendant Cloudflare's motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff will have until November 11, 2016 to file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants will have three weeks from November 11 to respond. The scheduling conference remains on calendar for November 28, 2016 at 8:30 AM Parties will file a joint Rule 26(f) report by noon on November 21, 2016. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux.
60
10/24/2016
AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: 59. CORRECT RULING ATTACHED.
61
10/28/2016
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., upon Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC served on 9/19/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sean D. Auton, agent for service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned.
62
11/08/2016
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge George H. Wu. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Wu will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9D on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
63
11/11/2016
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Tiger Media, Inc., Gerardus Van Ginneken.
64
11/11/2016
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Cloudflare, Inc., DOES, Dolphin Media Ltd., Hebergement OVH Inc., Hivelocity Ventures Corporation, OVH SAS, Steadfast Networks LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1, filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
65
11/18/2016
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
66
11/21/2016
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. Proof of service doc. no. 61 is defective as to 3.a. and 3.b. (mrgo)
67
11/21/2016
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
68
11/28/2016
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
69
11/28/2016
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Discovery cut-off 4/3/2017. Motions due by 6/1/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/24/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2017 at 08:30 AM Jury Trial set for 7/11/2017 at 09:00 AM Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux.
70
12/02/2016
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 64 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
71
12/05/2016
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., upon Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC served on 9/9/2016, answer due 10/11/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sean D. Auton, agent for service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned.
72
12/05/2016
Second REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
73
12/05/2016
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Steadfast Networks LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. (mrgo)
74
12/02/2016
RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: (Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 7, Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1) mailed to Ouh Sas at 2 Rue Kellerman, 59100 Roubaix, France and and Dolphin Media Ltd at Suite 801, 8/F, Singga Commercial Centre, 144-151 Connaught Road West, Hong Kong on 12/2/16. (mrgo)
75
12/08/2016
STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Steadfast Networks, LLC filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Proposed Order vacating default and setting date to respond to complaint)(Attorney Paul D Supnik added to party Steadfast Networks LLC(pty:dft)
1 Attachment
76
12/09/2016
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND SET DATE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Set Aside Default, 75. IT IS ORDERED that the default entered against defendant STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC on December 5, 2016 be vacated; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC shall have until January 6, 2017 to file and serve its response to the Second Amended Complaint herein; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC shall not contest jurisdiction or venue in its response to the Second Amended Complaint. (mrgo)
77
12/14/2016
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 64 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.(Attorney Tammy X Wu added to party Hivelocity Ventures Corporation(pty:dft))
78
12/19/2016
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (Attachment s: # 1 Proposed Order)
79
12/19/2016
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John L. Ambrogi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19078034) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
80
12/19/2016
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
81
12/20/2016
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) 78, APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John L. Ambrogi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19078034) 79, Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) 80. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed.
82
12/20/2016
Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
83
12/20/2016
Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John L. Ambrogi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19078034) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
84
12/20/2016
NOTICE OF LODGING filed December 20, 2016 re Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/19/2016, Receipt No. 0973-19077880) 82
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
85
12/22/2016
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 83 Non-Resident Attorney John L. Ambrogi APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Steadfast Networks, LLC, designating Paul D. Supnik as local counsel. (mrgo)
86
12/22/2016
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 82 Non-Resident Attorney Colin T.J. O'Brien APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Steadfast Networks, LLC, designating Paul D. Supnik as local counsel. (mrgo)
87
12/27/2016
RETURN RECEIPT Executed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., upon Defendant OVH SAS served on 12/7/2016, answer due 12/28/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon OVH SAS and signed by (signature illegible) by foreign service. (mrgo)
88
01/05/2017
Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC, identifying None. (O'Brien, Colin)
89
01/05/2017
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/9/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order Granting Defendant Steadfast Networks LLCs Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim) (O'Brien, Colin
1 Attachment
90
01/05/2017
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim 89 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
91
01/11/2017
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 89 previously scheduled for 02/09/2017 to 2/16/2017 at 08:30 AM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
92
01/16/2017
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. Waiver of Service signed by OVH SAS.
93
01/19/2017
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion filed by Defendant Dolphin Media Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Memorandum of Points and Authorities
2
Declaration of Tomas Mazal
3
Request For Judicial Notice
4
Exhibit A in support of Request For Judicial Notice
5
Exhibit B in support of Request For Judicial Notice
6
Exhibit C in support of Request For Judicial Notice
7
Exhibit D in support of Request For Judicial Notice
8
Exhibit E in support of Request For Judicial Notice
9
Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen M Kernan added to party Dolphin Media Ltd.(pty:dft)
9 Attachments
94
01/23/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93. The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
95
01/24/2017
Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dolphin Media Ltd. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
96
01/26/2017
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim 89 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
97
01/26/2017
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim 89 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
98
01/26/2017
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
99
01/27/2017
Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) 94, Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties 95, MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 96, Request for Judicial Notice 97, Stipulation for Protective Order 98 e-mailed to Ryan Evan Carreon at rcarreon@kermanlaw.net bounced due to typo in email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to rcarreon@kernanlaw.net. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
100
01/30/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties 95. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
101
01/30/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Protective Order 98. The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
102
02/01/2017
REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim 89 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
103
02/02/2017
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
104
02/03/2017
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon re Stipulation for Protective Order 103
105
02/06/2017
Opposition in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
106
02/06/2017
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
107
02/06/2017
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
15 Attachments
108
02/09/2017
SEALED DOCUMENT Spillane Declaration with Cloudflare Account Information re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93, Protective Order 104 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
1 Attachment
109
02/13/2017
DECLARATION of Justin Paine re Sealed Document, 108 Declaration in Support of Sealing Cloudflare Customer and Business Records filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
110
02/13/2017
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 filed by Defendant Dolphin Media Ltd.
1
Objections
2
Declaration of Tomas Mazal
2 Attachments
111
02/16/2017
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu re: 89 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant Steadfast's motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
112
02/17/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
113
02/23/2017
REQUEST to Dismiss Defendants Hebergement OVH Inc., OVH SAS filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
114
02/23/2017
SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT of DEFENDANTS JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
115
02/28/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
116
02/28/2017
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mark Thomas Gray on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Mark Thomas Gray added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))
117
02/27/2017
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT DOLPHIN MEDIA LIMITED'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, FOR IMPROPER VENUE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FORUM NON CONVENIENS 93 ; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Scheduling Conference continued to 3/13/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Parties will file a joint status report by noon on March 8, 2017. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
118
03/02/2017
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon.
119
03/02/2017
STATEMENT Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. re: MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity 118.
120
03/02/2017
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity 118 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
121
03/02/2017
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
122
03/02/2017
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
123
03/02/2017
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121
1
Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law
1 Attachment
124
03/02/2017
APPLICATION to file document Guinn Declaration, Exhibits G-U under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Application to Seal
2
Redacted Document Public Version of Declaration of Trey Guinn
3
Proposed Order
3 Attachments
125
03/02/2017
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Guinn Declaration, Exhibits G-U under seal 124 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Unredacted Document Guinn Declaration with Sealed Exhibits G-U
2
Proof of Service
2 Attachments
126
03/03/2017
STANDING ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu: You are instructed to read and to follow the requirements in Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 andCentral District of California Local Rules 56-1 through 56-3.
127
03/03/2017
ORDER GRANTING CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: 124 APPLICATION to Seal Document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Application to File Documents Under Seal is hereby GRANTED, and the following documents are ORDERED filed under seal: (see document for list). (mrgo)
128
03/07/2017
SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Trey Guinn, Exhibits G-U re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 127, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Proof of Service
1 Attachment
129
03/08/2017
STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
130
03/09/2017
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
131
03/09/2017
STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
132
03/09/2017
REQUEST TO CONTINUE FRCP R 56(d) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
133
03/09/2017
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K
12
Exhibit L
12 Attachments
134
03/09/2017
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
15 Attachments
135
03/10/2017
STATEMENT of Defendants Regarding Scheduling Conference re: Status Report 129.
136
03/10/2017
STATEMENT Plaintiff's Statement re 03 13 17 Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. re: Status Report 129.
137
03/13/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
138
03/13/2017
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties 95 Supplemental re Nationwide Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
139
03/13/2017
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties 95 Supplemental re Nationwide Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
7 Attachments
140
03/13/2017
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties 95 Supplemental re Nationwide Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
10 Attachments
141
03/13/2017
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer re scheduling. For reasons stated on the record, the scheduling conference is continued to March 27, 2017 at 8:30 AM Parties will file a joint scheduling report by noon on March 16, 2017. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux.
142
03/15/2017
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu; The Court has received Plaintiff's Request to Continue Hearing on Motion by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.'s for Partial Summary Judgment 132. The request is DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
143
03/16/2017
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
144
03/16/2017
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian ISO Partial Summary Judgment
2
Declaration of Kenneth Carter ISO Partial Summary Judgment
2 Attachments
145
03/16/2017
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 regarding Plaintiffs' Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact (Dkt. 131) filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
146
03/16/2017
Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
147
03/16/2017
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu re: Declaration (Motion related), 139, MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, 138, Declaration (Motion related), 140. The Court is now in receipt of Plaintiff's Offer of Proof. See Docket Nos. 138-140. The Offer of Proof delineates several specific contacts that Dolphin maintains with the United States, which Plaintiff contends are sufficient to establish nationwide jurisdiction. See Docket No. 138 at 3:12-16, 5:24-6:26. Because these contacts raise the possibility that nationwide jurisdiction exists, the Court orders Dolphin to submit a response by March 30, 2017. (mrgo)
148
03/20/2017
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Cloudflare, Inc., DOES, Dolphin Media Ltd., Hivelocity Ventures Corporation, Steadfast Networks LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1, filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
2 Attachments
149
03/20/2017
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Counsel are not present. Parties are ordered to appear on March 27, 2017 at 8:30 AM, and show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to appear at today's hearing. The Scheduling Conference is continued to March 27, 2017 at 8:30 AM Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (mrgo)
150
03/21/2017
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation to Serve Further Responses to Production Requests and to Produce Documents (Filed March 2, 2017; ECF No. 118) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation to Serve Further Responses to Production Requests and to Produce Documents, noticed for March 28, 2017, is vacated. The matter is taken under submission on the basis of the papers timely filed. Local Rule 7-15. re 118 Motion to Compel. (sbou)
151
03/22/2017
DECLARATION of SHAHROKH SHEIK IN RESPONSE TO MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity 118 Declaration filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
152
03/22/2017
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Based on the Minutes of the Scheduling Conference 141, the Order to Show Cause issed on March 20, 2017 149 is DISCHARGED. The Scheduling Conference remains set for March 27, 2017 at 8:30 AM THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
153
03/22/2017
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrokh Sheik counsel for Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. Adding Shahrokh Sheik as counsel of record for Hivelocity Ventures Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. (Attorney Shahrokh Sheik added to party Hivelocity Ventures Corporation(pty:dft))
154
03/27/2017
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer. Court sets the following: Service of Third Am. Complaint March 20, 2017; Steadfast Response 20 days after service of 3AC; Mediation Cutoff June 23, 2017; Post-Mediation Status Conference June 26, 2017 at 8:30 AM; Discovery Cutoff June 30, 2017; Expert discovery cutoff July 25, 2017; Motion hearing cutoff August 24, 2017; Pretrial conference September 21, 2017 at 8:30 AM; Jury trial (six day estimate) October 3, 2017 at 9:00 AM Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux.
155
03/28/2017
STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion MOTION to Compel Supplemental Responses to RFPs and Production of Documents against Defendant Hivelocity 118 filed by DEFENDANT Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
156
03/29/2017
ORDER WITHDRAWING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL 118 WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Re Stipulation 155.
157
03/30/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
158
03/30/2017
REPLY In Support of Supplemental NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93 Supplemental re: 4(k)(2) Nationwide Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Dolphin Media Ltd.
1
Declaration of Tomas Mazal
2
Evidentiary Objections
2 Attachments
159
03/30/2017
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 121. Parties will contact the court clerk by noon on March 30, 2017 whether a telephonic hearing at 3:00 PM will be necessary to resolve the deposition issue. The Court sets a status conference for April 13, 2017 at 8:30 AM Parties will file a joint status report regarding the status of discovery and the offer of proof as to the territoriality/extraterritoriality issue by noon on April 11, 2017. The above-entitled motion is continued to April 13, 2017 at 8:30 AM Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
160
03/31/2017
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel has advised the clerk that the deposition issue has been resolved. For that reason, the Court VACATES the status conference set for March 31 at 3:00 PM 159 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
161
04/04/2017
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 148 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
162
04/04/2017
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 148 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
163
04/10/2017
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, 148 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.(O'Brien, Colin)
164
04/11/2017
JOINT STATUS REPORT of Cloudflare Motion (4/13/17 hearing) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
165
04/13/2017
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARYJUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 ;STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion 93. Responses due by 4/20/2017 Replies due by 4/27/2017. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (mrgo)
166
04/14/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
167
04/19/2017
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on APRIL 13, 2017, 9:00 AM Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: SANDRA MACNEIL, phone number 213-894-5949; MACNEILSANDY@GMAIL.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2017.
168
04/19/2017
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings APRIL 13, 2017, 9:00 AM re Transcript 167 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY
169
04/20/2017
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
170
04/20/2017
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
22 Attachments
171
04/20/2017
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
11 Attachments
172
04/20/2017
STATEMENT of Separate Statement of Genuine Disputes NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
173
04/20/2017
STATEMENT of Demand to Lodge Guinn Deposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 (Offer of Proof) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
174
04/27/2017
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 following ALS Scan's Offer of Proof filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration (Supplemental) of Trey Guinn
2
Declaration of Nolan Schoichet
3
Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian
4
Proposed Order (Revised)
4 Attachments
175
04/27/2017
REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY RULING re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 as to ALS Scan's Offer of Proof in Opposition filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
176
04/28/2017
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 regarding Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Connection with Plaintiff's Offer of Proof (Dkt. 172) filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
177
04/30/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document, 175. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Civil Events - select - Motion and Related Filings - select Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/ Petitions/Requests - select - Requests - select - Ruling - follow the docketing prompts. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so.
178
05/01/2017
Motion to Strike New Arguments in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Extraterritoriality 121 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
179
05/03/2017
OPPOSITION to Plaintiff ALS Scan's Motion to Strike 178 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
180
05/04/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
181
05/04/2017
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 ; DOLPHIN MEDIA, LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION 93 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. Court hears further argument as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment. For reasons stated on the record, Defendants motion is continued to May 18, 2017 at 8:30 AM Counsel will contact the clerk by May 16 whether the appearance on May 18 will be required. Argument is held as to Defendant Dolphin's motion to dismiss. Based on the Tentative Rulings issued on February 27, 2017 and April 13, 2017, Defendant Dolphin's motion is GRANTED for lack of personal jurisdiction. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
182
05/08/2017
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Pursuant to the request of Plaintiff's counsel, CLOUDFLARE, INC.S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 previously scheduled for 05/18/2017 is CONTINUED to 5/25/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
183
05/17/2017
Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
184
05/25/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Carolyn Homer at carolynhomer@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
185
05/25/2017
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court's Ruling is circulated and attached hereto. Court hears argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion is continued to June 1, 2017 at 8:30 AM Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux.
186
05/26/2017
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/20/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon.
1
Joint Stipulation
2
Kassabian Declaration
3
Schoichet Declaration (SEALED BY THE COURT)
4
Spillane Declaration
5
Operative Scheduling Order (Dkt. 154)) Modified on 6/16/2017 (ib
5 Attachments
187
06/01/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
188
06/01/2017
MINUTES OF CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING EXTRATERRITORIALITY 121 granting in part and denying in part 121 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: Court hears further argument. The Court's Final Ruling is attached hereto. Based on the Court's Ruling, and for reasons stated on the record, Defendant's motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court DENIES Cloudflare's Motion as to the following thirteen sites: imgchili.com, slimpics.com, bestofsexpics.com, greenpics.com, imgspot.org, imgsen.se, imgspice.com, stooorage.com, img.yt, vipergirls.to, fboom.me, imgflash.net, and imgtrex.com. The Court GRANTS Defendant's Motion as to pornwire.net. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux.
189
06/02/2017
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 10/3/2017 to a trial state date of 2/13/2018 Re: Scheduling Conference, 154 filed by Defendants Cloudflare, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Memorandum in support of Continuance
2
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian
3
Declaration of Shahrokh Sheik
4
Declaration of John Ambrogi
5
Proposed Order
5 Attachments
190
06/05/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 10/3/2017 to a trial state date of 2/13/2018 Re: Scheduling Conference, 154 189. The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
191
06/06/2017
Partial Opposition in opposition to re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 10/3/2017 to a trial state date of 2/13/2018 Re: Scheduling Conference, 154 189 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
192
06/06/2017
Opposition in opposition to re: MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 186 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
193
06/06/2017
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 186 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
194
06/06/2017
APPLICATION to file document containing ALS confidential information under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Redacted Document Public Version of Supplemental Kassabian Declaration
1 Attachment
195
06/06/2017
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document containing ALS confidential information under seal 194 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Unredacted Document Sealed Version of Supplemental Kassabian Declaration and Exhibit A
2
Proof of Service
2 Attachments
196
06/07/2017
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with proposed order re APPLICATION to file document containing ALS confidential information under seal 194
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
197
06/07/2017
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting 194 APPLICATION File Information Under Seal. (NOTE: CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THE PROPOSED ORDER) (See document for details).
198
06/07/2017
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES 189 by Telephone held before Judge George H. Wu. Court and counsel confer off the record re above-entitled motion. The motion is TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: None Present.
199
06/13/2017
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel L. Rogna to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20011894) filed by defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
200
06/14/2017
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES 189 by Judge George H. Wu: Please refer to the Court's order for specifics.
201
06/14/2017
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE Attorney Daniel L. Rogna to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20011894) 199 on behalf of Steadfast Networks, LLC., designating Paul D. Supnik as local counsel, by Judge George H. Wu.
202
06/20/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder.
203
06/20/2017
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with revised proposed order following hearing re MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 186
1
Proposed Order (Revised)
1 Attachment
204
06/22/2017
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Magistrate for settlement proceedings. Filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.(O'Brien, Colin)
205
06/20/2017
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The Court orders the declaration of Nolan Schoichet in Support of defenant's Motion to Compel, Attachment #3 to defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel 186 filed UNDER SEAL. Counsel argue. The motion is submitted. Court Recorder: Recorded on Courtsmart.
206
06/23/2017
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 1 by Judge George H. Wu. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference.
207
06/26/2017
[DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 209] NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney John P. Flynn, Kevin D. Neal on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. Modified on 6/28/2017 (mrgo).
208
06/27/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Association of Counsel 207. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so.
209
06/28/2017
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Association of Counsel 207 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken. Out of District counsel shall file the appropriate Application to Appear in a Specific Case as a Pro Hac Vice and pay the applicable court fees. (mrgo)
210
06/28/2017
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part 186 Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery. (See document for details). ALS shall serve the amended interrogatory answers required by this order, shall produce the responsive documents required by this order, and shall provide the verifications required by this order by 7/14/17.
211
07/07/2017
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Productions and Responses re: RFPs 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 15, 20, 21, 30 and Interrogatories 6, 7, 9, 10 186 (Publication) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
212
07/07/2017
SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Publication filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian with Supporting Exhibits
1 Attachment
213
07/13/2017
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon re further granting of Defendant's MOTION to Compel 186. (See document for details).
214
07/10/2017
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/20/17, 10:00 AM Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/31/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2017.
215
07/10/2017
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6/20/17, 10:00 AM re Transcript 214 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
216
07/14/2017
STATEMENT Verification per Court Order filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. re: Order on Motion to Compel, 210.
217
07/14/2017
First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue time to Comply with 6/28 Order Interrogatory No. 9 from July 14, 2017 to July 24, 2017 Re: Order on Motion to Continue 200 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
218
07/15/2017
OPPOSITION re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue time to Comply with 6/28 Order Interrogatory No. 9 from July 14, 2017 to July 24, 2017 Re: Order on Motion to Continue 200 217 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration of Carolyn Homer
1 Attachment
219
07/17/2017
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part 217 plaintiff's EX PARTE APPLICATION for an extension of time to comply with the portion of the Courts Order 210 re Interrogatory No. 9. Plaintiff shall produce the updated spreadsheets as required by 7/21/17. This does not change or extend any dates previously set by the District Judge. Cloudflare's request for attorney's fees is denied.
220
07/18/2017
First STIPULATION to Continue Certain Cutoff Dates Re: Order on Motion to Continue 200 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
221
07/19/2017
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20207869) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
222
07/19/2017
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D. Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20207912) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
223
07/19/2017
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John P. Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 7/19/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20207869) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
224
07/19/2017
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D. Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 7/19/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20207912) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
225
07/21/2017
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 224 Non-Resident Attorney Kevin D. Neal APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., designating Jay M. Spillane as local counsel. (mrgo)
226
07/21/2017
ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 223 Non-Resident Attorney John P. Flynn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc., designating Jay M. Spillane as local counsel. (mrgo)
227
07/24/2017
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND CERTAIN CUTOFF DATES AND CONTINUE THE POST-MEDIATION CONFERENCE 220 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby ORDERS: 1. The mediation cutoff shall be extended to September 5, 2017. 2. The post-mediation status conference will take place on September 11, 2017 at 8:30 AM 3. The fact discovery cutoff will be extended to September 15, 2017. Any party who makes their witnesses available for deposition in September will stipulate to a two week review and signature period on deposition transcripts. 4. The expert disclosure/report deadline will be continued to September 15, 2017. 5. The rebuttal expert disclosure/report deadline will be October 6, 2017, notwithstanding the provisions of FRCP R26. 6. No other dates in the case are affected by this order. 7. This order is without prejudice to the rights of any party to make or oppose a motion to continue any other dates in the Court's scheduling order.
228
08/01/2017
ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Settlement Conference set for 8/21/2017 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See document for details).
229
08/11/2017
STATEMENT Election of Statutory Damages filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. re: Amended Complaint/Petition, 148.
230
08/14/2017
EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
231
08/14/2017
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices 230 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
9 Attachments
232
08/15/2017
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices 230 Supplemental filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 10
1 Attachment
233
08/15/2017
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices 230 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
234
08/15/2017
DECLARATION of John L. Ambrogi In Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices 230 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
235
08/15/2017
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices 230 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian
1 Attachment
236
08/15/2017
OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices 230 filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
237
08/16/2017
REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order for re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices 230 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
3 Attachments
238
08/16/2017
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part and denying in part 230 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Protective Order re Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices. (See document for details).
239
08/19/2017
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/24/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Memorandum in Support of Continuance
2
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian
3
Declaration of John Ambrogi
4
Proposed Order
4 Attachments
240
08/21/2017
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel for Defendants' failed to comply with Local Rule 6. For that reason, DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES 239 previously scheduled for 08/24/2017 is CONTINUED to 9/18/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
241
08/21/2017
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018 239 to 8/24/2017 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Memorandum
2
Declaration of John Ambrogi
3
Proposed Order
3 Attachments
242
08/22/2017
Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018 239 to 8/24/2017 241 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
243
08/22/2017
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. Defendant's Motion to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates is set for hearing on September 7, 2017 at 8:30 AM Any Opposition will be due by noon on August 29, 2017 and Reply will be filed by noon on September 1, 2017. Defendants' Ex Parte Application filed on August 24, 2017 241 is deemed MOOT.
244
08/21/2017
MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Settlement is reached between plaintiff and defendant Hivelocity. (See document for further details). Recorded on Courtsmart (Partially Under Seal).
245
08/22/2017
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon.
1
Memorandum Joint Stipulation on Cloudflare's Motion to Compel
2
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian with Exhibits
3
Declaration of Nolan Schoichet with Exhibits
4
Declaration of Jay Spillane
5
Exhibit 1 to Spillane Declaration
6
Exhibit 2 to Spillane Declaration
7
Exhibit 3 to Spillane Declaration
8
Exhibit 4 to Spillane Declaration
9
Exhibit 5 to Spillane Declaration
9 Attachments
246
08/29/2017
Opposition re: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018 239 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Declaration of Sarah Walsh
2
Declaration of Jay M. Spillane
2 Attachments
247
08/29/2017
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: A Telephone Conference re discovery is set for 8/31/2017 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See attached for call-in information).
248
08/29/2017
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery 245 pursuant to L.R. 37-2.3 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
249
08/31/2017
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Telephone conference re deposition schedule held. Recorded on Courtsmart.
250
09/01/2017
REPLY in support of Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from a trial start date of 1/9/2018 to a trial start date of 4/10/2018 239 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian
2
Declaration (Supplemental) of John Ambrogi
2 Attachments
251
09/08/2017
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial from January 9, 2018 to April 24, 2018 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
252
09/07/2017
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES 239 held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Courts Final Ruling. Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Parties will confer and file an updated proposed scheduling order by noon on September 11, 2017. The Post-Mediation Status Conference set for September 11, 2017 is TAKEN OFF-CALENDAR. Settlement is not reached. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux.
253
09/08/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue 251. The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so.
254
09/08/2017
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation to Continue 251 by Judge George H. Wu. The document is accepted as filed. Counsel shall lodge a Proposed Order to the Joint Stipulation on or before noon on September 11, 2017.
255
09/08/2017
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with proposed order on Joint Stipulation to continue trial dates following the Court's order on Defendants' Motion to Continue re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form, 254
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
256
09/08/2017
ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES by Judge George H. Wu: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2018 at 08:30 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/24/2017 at 09:00 AM Please refer to the Court's order for additional information.
257
09/12/2017
MINUTES OF Defendant, Cloudflare Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery [ECF # 245] held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Case called and appearances made. The Court and counsel discuss defendant Cloudflare's motion to compel discovery. Rulings and agreements of the parties are put on the record regarding certain issues. Other issues are reserved, pending further discussions between the parties. If the parties are unable to resolve the remaining issues, defendant Cloudflare may file a brief updating the Court on these issues, and plaintiff may then file a response within seven days. Court Recorder: CS 09/12/2017. (sbou)
258
09/12/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Cheryl Morones at cherylmorones@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
259
09/12/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Cheryl Morones at cherylmorones@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder.
260
09/15/2017
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/7/17 8:55 AM Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2017.
261
09/15/2017
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6/1/17 8:47 AM Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2017.
262
09/15/2017
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/25/17 9:29 AM Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Katie Thibodeaux, CSR, RPR, CRR, phone number www.katiethibodeaux.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2017.
263
09/15/2017
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/7/17 0:55 am; 6/1/17 8:47 am; 5/25/17 9:29 am re Transcript 260, 262, 261 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY
264
09/18/2017
REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
265
09/19/2017
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition of Cloudflare CEO filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/10/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon.
1
Memorandum -Joint Stipulation on Cloudflare's Motion for Protective Order
2
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian ISO Cloudflare's Motion
3
Declaration of Matthew Prince ISO Cloudflare's Motion
4
Declaration of Jay Spillane in Opposition to Cloudflare's Motion
5
Exhibit s A-H to the Spillane Declaration
6
Proposed Order
6 Attachments
266
09/19/2017
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT HIVELOCITY VENTURES CORPORATION by Judge George H. Wu: Granting 264 REQUEST to Dismiss Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. Terminating Hivelocity Ventures Corporation (a Florida corporation). Please refer to the Court's order for additional information.
267
09/20/2017
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/12/17 10:36 AM Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: EXCEPTIONAL REPORTING SERVICES, INC, phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2017.
268
09/20/2017
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 9/12/17 10:36 AM re Transcript 267 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
269
09/26/2017
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition of Cloudflare CEO 265 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian
2
Declaration (Supplemental) of Matthew Prince
2 Attachments
270
10/05/2017
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: On the Court's own motion, the hearing noticed for 10/10/17 on plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order 265, is VACATED. No appearances are necessary. The matter is submitted.
271
10/05/2017
SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Discovery 245 following 9/12/2017 hearing 257 and further meet-and-confer efforts filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration (Supplemental) of Rachel Kassabian with Exhibits
1 Attachment
272
10/06/2017
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part and denying in part 265 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order precluding the deposition of its CEO Matthew Prince. (See document for details).
273
10/16/2017
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrokh Sheik counsel for Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. Shahrokh Sheik will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
274
10/16/2017
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrokh Sheik counsel for Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. Tammy Wu will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
275
10/16/2017
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Lewis Holcomb, Jr counsel for Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation. John L. Holcomb, Jr. will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hivelocity Ventures Corporation.
276
10/18/2017
NOTICE OF LODGING filed with Proposed Order re MOTION to Compel Discovery 245
1
Proposed Order regarding Cloudflare's Pending Motion to Compel (Dkt. 245)
1 Attachment
277
10/18/2017
Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Discovery 245 (Second Cloudflare Brief) filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
278
10/19/2017
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Telephone Conference set for 10/20/2017 at 11:00AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See document for call-in information.)
279
10/20/2017
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference re discovery matters held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Rulings by the Court and agreements by the parties were placed on the record. Recorded on Courtsmart.
280
10/23/2017
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Karen Beck at karenbeck@quinnemanuel.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court recorder.
281
10/24/2017
Opposition re: MOTION to Compel Discovery 245 Supplemental Spillane Declaration filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
282
10/24/2017
APPLICATION to file document Exhibits P and Q, containing provisionally designated confidential ALS deposition testimony to the Second Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in Support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian - Omitting Exhibits P and Q
2
Proposed Order regarding confidentiality designations for Exhibits P and Q
2 Attachments
283
10/24/2017
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits P and Q, containing provisionally designated confidential ALS deposition testimony to the Second Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in Support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel under seal 282 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration of Rachel Kassabian - Containing Exhibits P and Q
1 Attachment
284
10/24/2017
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, 283 Exhibits P and Q (containing provisionally designated confidential ALS deposition testimony) to the Second Supplemental Kassabian Declaration in Support of Cloudflare's Motion to Compel served on 10/24/2017.
285
10/26/2017
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon granting in part and denying in part 245 Defendant's Motion to Compel. The discovery required by this order shall be provided by ALS no later than 11/6/17. (See document for details).
286
10/31/2017
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/20/2017. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., phone number (361) 949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2018.
287
10/31/2017
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/20/2017 re Transcript 286 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
288
11/01/2017
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon GRANTING 282 Defendant Cloudflare's APPLICATION to File Exhibits P and Q Under Seal in Connection with Its' Second Supplemental Kassabian Declaration.
289
11/02/2017
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Andrew P. Bridges of Fenwick & West LLP in place of attorney Rachel H. Kassabian of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
290
11/06/2017
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Andrew Bridges in place of attorneys Rachel Herrick Kassabian, Caroyln H. Homer, Mark Thomas Gray, filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. GRANTED. (cr) Modified on 11/6/2017
291
11/10/2017
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew P Bridges on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Andrew P Bridges added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))
292
11/10/2017
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jedediah Wakefield on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Jedediah Wakefield added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))
293
11/10/2017
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Armen Nercess Nercessian on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Armen Nercess Nercessian added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))
294
11/10/2017
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sapna S Mehta on behalf of Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. (Attorney Sapna S Mehta added to party Cloudflare, Inc.(pty:dft))
295
11/14/2017
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance 294, Notice of Appearance 292, Notice of Appearance 293. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so.
296
12/01/2017
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order Order
2
Proposed Order Separate Statement
2 Attachments
297
12/01/2017
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
298
12/01/2017
NOTICE OF LODGING OF DEPOSITION OF KARL ZIMMERMAN re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
299
12/01/2017
DECLARATION of Steve Easton in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit Notice of Manual Filing
1 Attachment
300
12/01/2017
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
22 Attachments
301
12/01/2017
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
6 Attachments
302
12/01/2017
DECLARATION of Sarah Walsh in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
303
12/14/2017
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Appendix Statement of Genuine Issues of Fact
2
Declaration of Kevin Stange
3
Declaration of Karl Zimmerman
4
Declaration of John Ambrogi
5
Exhibit A to Declaration of John Ambrogi
6
Exhibit B to Declaration of John Ambrogi
7
Exhibit C to Declaration of John Ambrogi
8
Exhibit D to Declaration of John Ambrogi
9
Exhibit E to Declaration of John Ambrogi
10
Exhibit F to Declaration of John Ambrogi
11
Exhibit G to Declaration of John Ambrogi
12
Exhibit H to Declaration of John Ambrogi
13
Exhibit I to Declaration of John Ambrogi
14
Exhibit J to Declaration of John Ambrogi
15
Exhibit K to Declaration of John Ambrogi
16
Exhibit L to Declaration of John Ambrogi
17
Exhibit M to Declaration of John Ambrogi
18
Exhibit N to Declaration of John Ambrogi
19
Exhibit O to Declaration of John Ambrogi
20
Exhibit P to Declaration of John Ambrogi
21
Exhibit Q to Declaration of John Ambrogi
22
Exhibit R to Declaration of John Ambrogi
23
Exhibit S to Declaration of John Ambrogi
24
Exhibit T to Declaration of John Ambrogi
25
Exhibit U to Declaration of John Ambrogi
25 Attachments
304
12/14/2017
APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Proposed Order
2
Redacted Document Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
3
Redacted Document Declaration of John Ambrogi
4
Redacted Document Exhibit A to Declaration of John Ambrogi
4 Attachments
305
12/14/2017
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal 304 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Unredacted Document Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
2
Unredacted Document Declaration of John Ambrogi with Exhibit A
2 Attachments
306
12/18/2017
ORDER GRANTING STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu: Granting 304 APPLICATION to Seal Document. Please refer to the Court's order for details.
307
12/19/2017
SEALED DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 306 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Declaration John Ambrogi Declaration with Exhibit A)(O'Brien, Colin
1 Attachment
308
12/21/2017
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
309
12/21/2017
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
310
12/27/2017
TEXT ENTRY ONLY: [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. The Court, on its own motion hereby continues the motion for partial summary judgment as to claims and defenses (Doc. No. 296) from January 1, 2018 at 8:30 AM to January 18, 2018 at 8:30 AM Parties are ORDERED to appear on new date and time specified herein. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ab) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
311
01/09/2018
Joint REQUEST for Hearing By Telephone Conference Regarding Summary Judgment Scheduling On Behalf of Defendants Cloudflare, Inc. and Steadfast Networks LLC filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Request set for hearing on 1/11/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges In Support of Defendants Cloudflare, Inc. and Steadfast Networks LLC's Request for Telephone Conference Regarding Summary Judgment Scheduling
2
Proposed Order Granting Defendants Cloudflare, Inc. and Steadfast Networks LLC's Request for Telephone Conference Regarding Summary Judgment Scheduling
2 Attachments
312
01/10/2018
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE, INC. AND STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC'S JOINTREQUEST FOR A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT SCHEDULING 311 by Judge George H. Wu: The Court GRANTS the request and ORDERS the parties to participate in a telephone conference on January 11, 2018 at 11:00 AM Counsel for Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., will provide and email the court clerk and other counsel in this matter with a call-in number for the hearing at 11:00 AM.
313
01/11/2018
MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:Court and counsel confer. The Court will allow any motion for summary judgment to be filed as long as the requirements of Local Rule 6 are met. Defendant Steadfasts Motion for Summary Judgment 296, set for January 18, 2018, is continued to February 1, 2018 at 8:30 AM Defendant Steadfasts amended opposition to Plaintiffs statement of undisputed facts will be filed by January 16, 2018. Plaintiff ALS is to file an amended reply to Defendants amended opposition and additional facts by close of business January 19, 2018. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux.
314
01/11/2018
AMENDED MINUTES held before Judge George H. Wu re: Telephone Conference, 313. Defendant Steadfast's Motion for Summary Judgment 296, set for January 18, 2018, is continued to February 1, 2018 at 8:30 AM Defendant Steadfast's amended opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgement will be amended to reflect the paragraphs (starting at No. 44) that will be in the Defendant Steadfast Network's statement of additional undisputed facts by January 16, 2018. Only the citations will be amended and nothing further. Plaintiff ALS is to file an amended reply to Defendant's amended opposition and additional facts by close of business January 19, 2018. (mrgo)
315
01/16/2018
APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Declaration of Colin O'Brien
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B
4
Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Colin
4 Attachments
316
01/16/2018
SEALED DOCUMENT re APPLICATION to file document under seal 315, Telephone Conference, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines, 313 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Declaration of Colin O'Brien
2
Exhibit A
3
Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Colin
3 Attachments
317
01/18/2018
ORDER GRANTING STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: granting 315 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details) (mrgo)
318
01/18/2018
SEALED APPLICATION re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 317 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Colin
2 Attachments
319
01/19/2018
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 Steadfast's Statement of Genuine Issues filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
320
01/19/2018
Objections in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 Steadfast's Statement of Genuine Issues filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
321
01/26/2018
APPLICATION to file document Reply to Additional Statement of Facts under seal filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Declaration of Colin O'Brien
2
Redacted Document
3
Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Colin
3 Attachments
322
01/26/2018
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Reply to Additional Statement of Facts under seal 321 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Declaration of Colin O'Brien
2
Unredacted Document)(O'Brien, Colin
2 Attachments
323
01/29/2018
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC 296 previously scheduled for 02/01/2018 to 2/5/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
324
01/30/2018
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/5/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order Separate Statement
2
Proposed Order
2 Attachments
325
01/30/2018
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
326
01/30/2018
DECLARATION of Sarah Walsh in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
327
01/30/2018
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I
10
Exhibit J
11
Exhibit K
12
Exhibit L
13
Exhibit M
14
Exhibit N
15
Exhibit O
15 Attachments
328
01/30/2018
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
329
01/30/2018
DECLARATION of Steve Easton in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
330
01/30/2018
EXHIBIT Easton Exs. - Manual Filing to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
331
01/30/2018
EXHIBIT Penn Exs. - Manual Filing to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
332
01/31/2018
ORDER GRANTING STEADFAST NETWORKS LLC'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: 321 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
333
01/31/2018
SEALED DOCUMENT Reply to Additional Statement of Facts re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 332 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.(O'Brien, Colin)
334
01/31/2018
APPLICATION to file document Spillane Decl. Ex. A Doc 327-1 under seal filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
1 Attachment
335
01/31/2018
EXHIBIT B to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 Easton Decl. Doc. 329 Ex. B filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
336
02/01/2018
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit to Motion 330, Exhibit to Motion 331. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notices > Manual Filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
337
02/01/2018
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION to file document Spillane Decl. Ex. A Doc 327-1 under seal 334, Exhibit to Motion 335. The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): Please refer to L.R. 79 for the proper e-filing procedure. Or go to our Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov, go to the E-Filing tab, click on Sealed Documents. There should be 2 docket entries made: 1) Application (as main document), Proposed order (as 1st attachment), & Redacted Document (as 2nd attachment); 2) Sealed Declaration in Support (as main document) & Unredacted Document (as 1st attachment). Title page is missing on doc. no. 335. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
338
02/01/2018
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Colin
1 Attachment
339
02/01/2018
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA 338 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Supplement State of Uncontroverted Facts)(O'Brien, Colin
1 Attachment
340
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of John L. Ambrogi in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA 338 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H)(O'Brien, Colin
8 Attachments
341
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of Kevin Stange in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA 338 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. (O'Brien, Colin)
342
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of Karl Zimmerman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA 338 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C)(O'Brien, Colin
3 Attachments
343
02/01/2018
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/12/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Proposed Order) (O'Brien, Colin
1 Attachment
344
02/01/2018
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI 343 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Supplement Statement of Uncontroverted Facts)(O'Brien, Colin
1 Attachment
345
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of John L. Ambrogi in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI 343 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
9
Exhibit I)(O'Brien, Colin
9 Attachments
346
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of Karl Zimmerman in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI 343 filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C)(O'Brien, Colin
3 Attachments
347
02/01/2018
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/5/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.
1
Memorandum in Support of Cloudflare's Motion for Summary Judgment [Redacted Public Version]
1 Attachment
348
02/01/2018
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347
1
Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law
2
Proposed Judgment
2 Attachments
349
02/01/2018
APPLICATION to file document in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Proposed Order
2
Redacted Document [Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment]
3
Redacted Document [Decl of Andrew Bridges in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment]
4
Redacted Document [Exhibit 5 to Decl of Andrew Bridges]
5
Redacted Document [Decl of Justin Paine in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment]
5 Attachments
350
02/01/2018
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal 349 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Application to Seal
2
Unredacted Document [Confidential Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment]
3
Unredacted Document [Confidential Decl of Andrew Bridges in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment]
4
Exhibit 2 to the Decl of Andrew Bridges
5
Exhibit 5 to the Decl of Andrew Bridges
6
Exhibit 6 to the Decl of Andrew Bridges
7
Exhibit 12 to the Decl of Andrew Bridges
8
Unredacted Document [Decl of Justin Paine in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment]
9
Exhibit 25 to Decl of Justin Paine
9 Attachments
351
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of Albert Lee Guinn III in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Declaration G
8
Exhibit H
8 Attachments
352
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of Nick Sullivan in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
353
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of Justin Paine in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Declaration 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
23
Declaration 23
24
Exhibit 24
25
Exhibit 25
25 Attachments
354
02/01/2018
DECLARATION of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Supplement 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
23
Exhibit 23
24
Exhibit 24
25
Exhibit 25
26
Exhibit 26
27
Exhibit 27
28
Exhibit 28
29
Exhibit 29
30
Exhibit 30
30 Attachments
355
02/02/2018
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., re APPLICATION to file document in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment under seal 349 served on February 2, 2018.
356
02/02/2018
NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY - BMG V. COX (4TH CIR. 2/1/18) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Claims and Defenses re Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC 296 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
357
02/05/2018
ORDER GRANTING CLOUDFLARE, INC.'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge George H. Wu re: 349 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
358
02/05/2018
ORDER RE APPLICATION TO FILE EXHIBIT UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT CLOUDFLARE INC. by Judge George H. Wu re: 334 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (mrgo)
359
02/05/2018
SEALED DOCUMENT [Unredacted Version of Cloudflare, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment] re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347, Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal 357 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Unredacted Version of Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
2
Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges
3
Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges
4
Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges
5
Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges
6
Unredacted version of Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
7
Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Justin Paine
7 Attachments
360
02/05/2018
MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT STEADFAST NETWORKS, LLC 296 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 324, and Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment 347, set for March 5, 2018, are continued to March 12, 2018 at 8:30 AM Counsel may stipulate to the briefing schedule. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
361
02/06/2018
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Attorney Steadfast Networks LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Susan Pippin at spippin@partridgepartnerspc.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
362
02/07/2018
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Cloudflare, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Marti Guidoux at mguidoux@fenwick.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter.
363
02/08/2018
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment Motions filed by Defendant Steadfast Networks LLC.
1
Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Colin
1 Attachment
364
02/12/2018
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING OPPOSITION AND REPLY DEADLINES FOR ALL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 363. (Responses due by 2/16/2018, Replies due by 2/26/2018.) (mrgo)
365
02/16/2018
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA 338, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI 343 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
366
02/16/2018
STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA 338 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
367
02/16/2018
Request for Evidentiary Ruling in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC. RE: DMCA 338 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
368
02/16/2018
STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI 343 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
369
02/16/2018
Request for Evidentiary Ruling in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to PLAINTIFF ALS SCAN, INC.'S COUNTS II, III, & VI 343 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
370
02/16/2018
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
371
02/16/2018
STATEMENT of Genuine Issues in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
372
02/16/2018
Request for Evidentiary Ruling in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
373
02/16/2018
DECLARATION of Jay M. Spillane in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
19 Attachments
374
02/16/2018
DECLARATION of Eric Penn in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
10 Attachments
375
02/16/2018
DECLARATION of Shahram Ghandeharizadeh in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment 347 filed by Plaintiff ALS Scan, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
4 Attachments
376
02/16/2018
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 [Public Redacted Version] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
377
02/16/2018
Objection in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 [Cloudflare, Inc.'s Request for Evidentiary Ruling on Specified Objections in Opposition to ALS's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment] filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
378
02/16/2018
STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes in Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
379
02/16/2018
APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Proposed Order Granting Cloudflare's Application to File Documents Under Seal
2
Redacted Document [Cloudflare's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
3
Redacted Document [Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support Support of Cloudflares Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
4
Redacted Document Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges
5
Redacted Document [Declaration of Justin Paine in Support Support of Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
5 Attachments
380
02/16/2018
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal 379 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Unredacted Document [Cloudflare's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
2
Unredacted Document [Declaration of Justin Paine in Support of Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
3
Unredacted Document [Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Justin Paine]
4
Unredacted Document [Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges in Support of Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
5
Unredacted Document [Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges]
6
Unredacted Document [Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges]
7
Unredacted Document [Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges]
8
Unredacted Document [Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Andrew P. Bridges]
8 Attachments
381
02/16/2018
DECLARATION of Albert Lee Guinn III in Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
2
Exhibit B
3
Exhibit C
4
Exhibit D
5
Exhibit E
6
Exhibit F
7
Exhibit G
8
Exhibit H
8 Attachments
382
02/16/2018
DECLARATION of Nick Sullivan in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Exhibit A
1 Attachment
383
02/16/2018
DECLARATION of Justin Paine in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
23
Exhibit 23
24
Exhibit 24
25
Exhibit 25 [Filed Under Seal]
26
Exhibit 26
27
Exhibit 27
27 Attachments
384
02/16/2018
DECLARATION of Andrew P. Bridges in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Third Amended Complaint against Cloudflare Inc. 324 filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2 [Filed Under Seal]
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5 [Redacted Version]
6
Exhibit 6 [Filed Under Seal]
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
Exhibit 9
10
Exhibit 10
11
Exhibit 11
12
Exhibit 12 [Filed Under Seal]
13
Exhibit 13
14
Exhibit 14
15
Exhibit 15
16
Exhibit 16
17
Exhibit 17
18
Exhibit 18
19
Exhibit 19
20
Exhibit 20
21
Exhibit 21
22
Exhibit 22
23
Exhibit 23
24
Exhibit 24
25
Exhibit 25
26
Exhibit 26
27
Exhibit 27
28
Exhibit 28
29
Exhibit 29
30
Exhibit 30
30 Attachments
385
02/16/2018
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Cloudflare, Inc., re APPLICATION to file document in Connection with Cloudflare's Opposition to ALS Scan, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal 379 served on February 16, 2018.
386
02/21/2018
ORDER GRANTING CLOUDFLARE'S APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH ITS OPPOSITION TO ALS SCAN, INC.'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu re: 379 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for list) (mrgo)
530
05/14/2018
Attorney Fees
531
05/14/2018
Memorandum in Support of Motion
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2018
Notice of Filing Transcript (Text entry; no document attached.)
535
06/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
537
06/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
538
06/11/2018
Reconsideration
539
06/12/2018
Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
541
06/21/2018
~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
542
07/09/2018
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
543
07/16/2018
Reply (Motion related)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.