Alsco Inc. v. Benihana, Inc.
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00236 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/10/2018
Complaint
2
10/10/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
10/10/2018
Corporate Disclosure Statement
4
10/10/2018
Unissued Summons
10/10/2018
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
10/16/2018
Order
6
10/17/2018
Notice (Other)
7
10/18/2018
Affidavit
8
11/04/2018
Notice of Appearance
9
11/04/2018
Notice of Appearance
10
11/20/2018
Initial Case Status Report Order
11
11/21/2018
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.