Altshiler v. State of Alaska
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00259 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
64
06/25/2018
In Limine
65
07/03/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
66
07/09/2018
Transcript
67
07/09/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
68
07/12/2018
DEPS Notice
69
07/12/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
70
07/16/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
71
07/16/2018
Witness List
72
07/16/2018
Exhibit List
73
07/16/2018
Notice (Other)
74
07/16/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
75
07/16/2018
Exhibit List
76
07/18/2018
Sanctions
77
07/18/2018
Affidavit
78
07/18/2018
Expedite
79
07/18/2018
Affidavit
80
07/18/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite
81
07/19/2018
Order on Motion in Limine
82
07/19/2018
Witness List
83
07/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
84
07/19/2018
Affidavit
85
07/20/2018
Continue
86
07/20/2018
Expedite
87
07/20/2018
Declaration
07/23/2018
Pretrial Conference - Final (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/23/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
07/23/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
90
07/23/2018
Trial Brief
91
07/23/2018
Objections to Exhibits
92
07/23/2018
Witness List
93
07/23/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
94
07/23/2018
Notice (Other)
95
07/23/2018
Proposed Voir Dire
96
07/24/2018
Exhibit List
97
07/24/2018
Trial Brief
98
07/30/2018
Notice (Other)
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/25/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
09/25/2018
Stipulation of Dismissal
09/26/2018
Order on Stipulation (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.