Alvanna v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00166 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
06/18/2018
Witness List
11
06/19/2018
Witness List
12
09/04/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
13
09/19/2018
Notice of Settlement
14
09/20/2018
Order
15
10/17/2018
Notice (Other)
16
10/18/2018
Order
17
10/22/2018
Stipulation
18
10/24/2018
Order Dismissing Case
19
11/01/2018
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.