American Chiropractic Assoc v. American Specialty Health inc
Court Docket Sheet

3rd Circuit Court of Appeals

2014-01832 (ca3)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 290 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
04/09/2014
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz in District Court No. 2-12-cv-07243.
04/09/2014
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/10/2014
Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 04/10/2014. (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
04/22/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven A. Schwartz on behalf of Appellant(s) American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke, D.C. and Carol A. Lietz.
doc
04/22/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from D. Brian Hufford on behalf of Appellant(s) American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke, D.C. and Carol A. Lietz.
doc
04/22/2014
ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz advising this court that.
doc
04/22/2014
ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz, received.
doc
04/22/2014
ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz, filed.
doc
04/22/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Warren Haskel on behalf of Appellee(s) Connecticut General Life Insurance Co., Cigna Corp.--[Edited 04/23/2014 by CLW]
doc
04/23/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William H. Pratt on behalf of Appellee(s) Connecticut General Life Insurance Co., Cigna Corp.
doc
04/25/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Francine Friedman Griesing Griesing Law, LLC 1717 Arch Street, Suite 3630 Philadelphia, PA 19103 (215) 618.3720 fgriesing@griesinglaw.com on behalf of Appellee(s) CIGNA Corporation and Connecticut General Life Insurance Company.
doc
04/25/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kathryn Goldstein Legge, Esquire 1717 Arch Street Suite 3630 Philadelphia, PA 19103 215-618-3720 klegge@griesinglaw.com on behalf of Appellee(s) CIGNA Corporation and Connecticut General Life Insurance Company.
doc
04/28/2014
FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael P. Daly, Esq. for American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc and Richard M. Haggerty, Jr., Esq. for American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/12/2014. Disclosure Statement on or before 05/12/2014.
doc
04/29/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Richard M. Haggerty, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) American Specialty Health, Inc.; American Specialty Health Networks, Inc.
doc
04/29/2014
ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee American Specialty Health Inc, filed.
doc
04/29/2014
ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee American Specialty Health Networks Inc, filed.
doc
04/29/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael P. Daly on behalf of Appellee(s) American Specialty Health, Inc.; American Specialty Health Networks, Inc.
doc
04/29/2014
ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Cigna Corp, filed.
doc
04/29/2014
ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Connecticut General Life Insurance Co, filed.
doc
04/30/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Frank M. Holozubiec on behalf of Appellee(s) Connecticut General Life Insurance Co., Cigna Corp.
doc
04/30/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua B. Simon on behalf of Appellee(s) Connecticut General Life Insurance Co., Cigna Corp.
doc
05/01/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Anthony F. Maul on behalf of Appellant(s) American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke, D.C., Carol A. Lietz.
doc
05/07/2014
BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz due on or before 06/16/2014. Appendix due on or before 06/16/2014.
doc
05/14/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jason S. Cowart on behalf of Appellant(s) American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke, D.C. and Carol A. Lietz.
doc
05/20/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Elizabeth Mann on behalf of Appellee(s) American Specialty Health, Inc.; American Specialty Health Networks, Inc.
doc
05/20/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Charles A. Rothfeld on behalf of Appellee(s) American Specialty Health, Inc.; American Specialty Health Networks, Inc.
doc
05/20/2014
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew Z. Edelstein on behalf of Appellee(s) American Specialty Health, Inc.; American Specialty Health Networks, Inc.
doc
06/16/2014
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/16/2014 by ECF, US mail.
doc
06/16/2014
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke, Carol A Lietz and Appellees American Specialty Health Inc, American Specialty Health Networks Inc, Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co, filed. Certificate of service dated 06/16/2014 by ECF, US mail.
06/17/2014
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/17/2014
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz - Joint Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 3 (Volume I attached to Brief). (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
07/01/2014
ECF FILER: JOINT Motion filed by Appellees American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc for Extension of Time to file Response Brief for 14 days and motion for expansion of the page limitations for the reply brief. Certificate of Service dated 07/01/2014.--[Edited 07/03/2014 by CLW]
doc
07/03/2014
ORDER (Clerk) Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefs and for Expansion of the Page Limitations for Reply Brief. The motion for extension of time is granted. Appellee's briefs must be filed and served on or before August 4, 2014. Appellants' reply brief, if any must be filed and served on or before August 25, 2014. The motion for expansion of the page limit for the reply brief is denied without prejudice to renewal after Appellees' briefs are filed. Appellant's should file, if necessary, a new motion specifying a proposed total word court for the reply brief as calculated under Fed. R. App. P. 32 (a)(7)(B), rather than a page limit. Prior to filing a new motion, however, Appellant's should review the Court's Standing Order of January 9, 2012, filed.
doc
08/04/2014
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/04/2014 by ECF.
doc
08/04/2014
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/04/2014 by ECF.
08/05/2014
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co - Brief. Copies: 7. (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2014
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellees American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc - Brief. Copies: 7. (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
08/25/2014
ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz, filed. Certificate of Service dated 08/25/2014 by US mail, ECF.
08/26/2014
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz - Reply Brief. Copies: 7. (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2014
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney D. Brian Hufford, Esq. for Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 11/20/2014 (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2014
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Charles A. Rothfeld, Esq. for Appellees American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 11/20/2014 (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/02/2014
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Joshua B. Simon, Esq. for Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 11/21/2014 (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/03/2014
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jason S. Cowart, Esq. for Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz. Counsel is unavailable for the following dates: 11/20/2014, 11/21/2014 (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
09/17/2014
Calendared for Tuesday, 11/18/2014 in Newark, NJ. (Rescheduled from Tuesday, 11/18/2014 in Phila. PA).
doc
09/18/2014
ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney D. Brian Hufford, Esq. for Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz. Certificate of Service dated 09/18/2014.
doc
09/18/2014
ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Charles A. Rothfeld, Esq. for Appellees American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc. Certificate of Service dated 09/18/2014.
doc
09/19/2014
ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Joshua B. Simon, Esq. for Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co. Certificate of Service dated 09/19/2014.
doc
09/26/2014
ORDER (Clerk) At the direction of the Court, the appeals at Nos. 14-1832 and 14-2101 are hereby consolidated for disposition. The appeals are tentatively calendared for Tuesday, November 18, 2014 in Newark, NJ. It may become necessary for the panel to move the cases to another day within the week of November 17, 2014. Counsel will be notified if such a change occurs, filed. [14-1832, 14-2101]
09/29/2014
Calendared for Tuesday, 11/18/2014 in Newark, NJ. [14-1832, 14-2101][Document removed, document entered correctly on 09/29/14.]--[Edited 09/29/2014 by TLG] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
09/29/2014
Calendared for Tuesday, 11/18/2014 in Newark, NJ. [14-1832, 14-2101]
doc
09/30/2014
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Eric D. Katz, Esq. for Appellant North Jersey Brain & Spine Center in 14-2101 Letter to Marcia M. Waldron, Clerk from Eric D. Katz, Esq. Re Consoldated Disposition of Cases. Certificate of Service dated 09/30/2014. [14-1832, 14-2101]
doc
09/30/2014
ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Eric D. Katz, Esq. for Appellant North Jersey Brain & Spine Center in 14-2101 Letter to Marcia M. Waldron, Clerk from Eric D. Katz, Esq. Re Consoldiated Disposition of Cases. Certificate of Service dated 09/30/2014. [14-2101, 14-1832]
doc
10/03/2014
ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Joshua B. Simon, Esq. for Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co. Certificate of Service dated 10/03/2014. [14-1832, 14-2101]
doc
10/06/2014
ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Charles A. Rothfeld, Esq. for Appellees American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc. Certificate of Service dated 10/06/2014. [14-1832, 14-2101]
doc
10/07/2014
ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney D. Brian Hufford, Esq. for Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz in 14-1832. Certificate of Service dated 10/07/2014. [14-1832, 14-2101]
doc
10/08/2014
ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co to supplement the Appellate Record. Certificate of Service dated 10/08/2014.
doc
10/20/2014
ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz to Motion to supplement. Certificate of Service dated 10/20/2014.
doc
10/29/2014
ECF FILER: Reply by Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co to Appellant's Response to Motion, filed. Certificate of Service dated 10/29/2014. --[Edited 10/29/2014 by EAF - Text edited]
doc
11/03/2014
Oral Argument Notification for Wednesday, 11/19/2014 in Newark, NJ. [14-1832, 14-2101]
doc
11/05/2014
ORDER (CHAGARES, HARDIMAN and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) granting Motion to supplement Record, filed. Chagares, Authoring Judge.
doc
11/05/2014
ECF FILER: DIVISION OF TIME FORM filed by Attorney Eric D. Katz, Esq. for Appellant North Jersey Brain & Spine Center. Certificate of Service dated 11/05/2014. [14-1832, 14-2101]
doc
11/06/2014
ECF FILER: Letter dated 11/06/2014, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable.
doc
11/06/2014
ECF FILER: Motion filed by Amicus Appellants American Medical Association and Medical Society of New Jersey in 14-2101 to participate in oral argument on behalf of Amicus Appellants American Medical Association and Medical Society of New Jersey in 14-2101. Certificate of Service dated 11/06/2014. [14-2101, 14-1832]
doc
11/10/2014
ECF FILER: DIVISION OF TIME FORM filed by Attorney Joshua B. Simon, Esq. for Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co. Certificate of Service dated 11/10/2014.
doc
11/10/2014
ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 11/10/2014. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable.
doc
11/11/2014
ECF FILER: Letter dated 11/11/2014, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellees American Specialty Health Inc and American Specialty Health Networks Inc. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable.
doc
11/17/2014
ORDER (CHAGARES, HARDIMAN and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges) granting Motion participate in oral argument filed by Amicus Appellants Medical Society of New Jersey and American Medical Association, filed. The Honorable Michael A. Chagares, Authoring Judge.
11/19/2014
ARGUED on Wednesday, November 19, 2014 in Newark, NJ. Panel: CHAGARES, HARDIMAN and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges. D. Brian Hufford arguing for Appellant American Chiropractic Association; D. Brian Hufford arguing for Amicus Appellant American Medical Association; Eric D. Katz arguing for Appellant North Jersey Brain & Spine Center; Joshua B. Simon arguing for Appellee Cigna Corp; Edward S. Wardell arguing for Appellee Aetna Inc. [14-2101, 14-1832] (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
11/19/2014
COURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [14-2101, 14-1832, 13-4654]
doc
03/17/2015
ECF FILER: Letter dated 03/17/2015, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable.
doc
03/18/2015
ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Cigna Corp and Connecticut General Life Insurance Co to Rule 28(j) letter. Certificate of Service dated 03/18/2015. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable.
doc
06/03/2015
ECF FILER: Letter dated 06/03/2015, filed pursuant to Rule 28(j) from counsel for Appellants American Chiropractic Association, Steven G. Clarke and Carol A Lietz. This document will be SENT TO THE MERITS PANEL, if/when applicable.
doc
09/11/2015
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: CHAGARES, HARDIMAN and SHWARTZ, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 15. Judge: SHWARTZ Authoring.
doc
09/11/2015
JUDGMENT, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED by this Court that the order of the District Court entered March 27, 2014, be and the same is hereby AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, and REMANDED for further proceedings. All of the above in accordance with the opinion of this Court. The parties shall bear their own costs.
doc
10/05/2015
MANDATE ISSUED, filed. (SB) [Entered: 10/05/2015 08:48 AM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.