American Humanist Association et al v. Baxter County, Arkansas et al
Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Arkansas

3:2014-cv-03126 (arwd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 832 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/23/2014
COMPLAINT against Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5004618), filed by American Humanist Association, Dessa Blackthorn.
1
Exhibit 1
2
Exhibit 2
3
Exhibit 3
4
Exhibit 4
5
Exhibit 5
6
Exhibit 6
7
Exhibit 7
8
Exhibit 8
9
https://ecf.arwd.uscourts.gov/doc1/02911275491" onClick="goDLS{{'/doc1/02911275491','45881','8','','2','1','',''}};">9</a> Exhibit 9)
9 Attachments
2
12/23/2014
CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by American Humanist Association, Dessa Blackthorn.
3
12/23/2014
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Issued as to Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service.
4
12/23/2014
Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished.
5
12/23/2014
MOTION for Attorney David A. Niose to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 5004618) by American Humanist Association, Dessa Blackthorn.
6
12/23/2014
MOTION for Attorney Monica Lynn Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 5004618) by American Humanist Association, Dessa Blackthorn.
12/23/2014
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David A. Niose is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 23, 2014. (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/23/2014
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Monica Lynn Miller is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if she has not already done so and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 23, 2014. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/24/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Lynn Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs.
8
12/24/2014
NOTICE of Appearance by David Niose on behalf of All Plaintiffs.
9
01/08/2015
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants.
10
01/23/2015
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass.
11
01/26/2015
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 3/18/2015 02:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2015. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 26, 2015.
12
03/11/2015
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by American Humanist Association, Baxter County, Arkansas, Dessa Blackthorn, Mickey Pendergrass.
1
Exhibit Parties Joint Statement pursuant to Scheduling Order
1 Attachment
03/18/2015
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks: Case Management Hearing held on 3/18/2015. (Dana Hayden-Court Reporter)(Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 509) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
03/31/2015
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2015 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Jury Trial set for 10/15/2015 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 31, 2015.
14
04/03/2015
ORDER Setting Hearing : Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2015 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Erin L. Setser. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on April 3, 2015.
15
07/08/2015
MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Humanist Association.
1
Exhibit Deposition of Mickey Pendergrass
2
Exhibit Deposition of Rick Spencer
3
Exhibit Deposition of Edward Majeste
4
Exhibit Deposition of Dessa Blackthorn
5
Exhibit Affidavit of John Eberhard
5 Attachments
16
07/08/2015
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Humanist Association.
17
07/08/2015
STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Humanist Association.
18
07/10/2015
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass.
19
07/10/2015
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass.
20
07/10/2015
STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass.
1
Exhibit 1 Deposition of Blackthorn
2
Exhibit 2 Deposition of Spencer
3
Exhibit 3 Deposition of Pendergrass
3 Attachments
21
07/21/2015
RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Dessa Blackthorn and American Humanist Association filed by American Humanist Association.
1
Exhibit FOI response from Pendergrass
1 Attachment
22
07/21/2015
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 19 Memorandum Brief in Support of Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by American Humanist Association.
23
07/21/2015
STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dessa Blackthorn.
24
07/22/2015
***PLEASE DISREGARD- ATTORNEY WILL REFILE***REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass. Modified on 7/22/2015 to correct link to doc 18 (jrs). Modified on 7/23/2015 to add text and resend NEF
25
07/22/2015
RESPONSE by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass re 17 Statement of Facts. Modified on 7/23/2015 to correct link
26
07/23/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass.
07/23/2015
TEXT ONLY ORDER re 14 Order Setting/Resetting Hearings. Settlement Conference for 7/29/15 is hereby cancelled. If parties believe a settlement conference may be beneficial in the future, a joint motion requesting a settlement conference should be filed. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on July 23, 2015. (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
07/28/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Humanist Association.
1
Exhibit Email re initial disclosures
1 Attachment
28
09/02/2015
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by American Humanist Association.
1
Exhibit Witness List
2
Exhibit Exhibit List
3
Exhibit Deposition Designations with Objection
3 Attachments
29
09/02/2015
PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE SHEET by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass.
30
09/23/2015
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: BENCH Trial set for 10/15/2015 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. NOTE: Final Pre-Trial Conference terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 23, 2015.
09/28/2015
TEXT ONLY ORDER. The parties have represented to the Court that they agree there are no genuine issues of material fact to be tried, and that they agree it would be best to forego a trial in this case and to allow the Court to rule as a matter of law. Accordingly, the Amended Case Management Order (Doc. 30) filed on September 23, 2015, and the deadlines set therein are VACATED, and the Bench Trial is removed from the docket. If any issues remain after the Court has ruled on the parties' pending motions for summary judgment (Docs. 15, 18), then at that time the Court will provide the parties with further instructions. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 28, 2015. (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2015
TEXT ORDER ONLY - Per Text Order dated 9/28/15 - BENCH TRIAL and all related deadlines terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 28, 2015. (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
11/12/2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Claims against Judge Pendergrass in his individual capacity are Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 12, 2015.
32
11/12/2015
JUDGMENT in favor of American Humanist Association, Dessa Blackthorn against Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass in the amount of $1.00. See order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 12, 2015.
33
11/18/2015
MOTION for Attorney Fees by American Humanist Association.
1
Exhibit Exhibit A. Declaration of David Niose
2
Exhibit Exhibit B. Declaration of Monica Miller
3
Exhibit Exhibit C. Affidavit of Gerry Schulze
4
Exhibit Exhibit D. Affidavit of Scott Poynter
5
Exhibit Exhibit E. Affidavit of William Gary Holt
6
Exhibit Exhibit F. Billing Record
6 Attachments
34
11/18/2015
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 33 MOTION for Attorney Fees by American Humanist Association.
35
11/24/2015
Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by American Humanist Association.
1
Exhibit Affidavit of Ralph Cloar
1 Attachment
36
12/02/2015
RESPONSE to Motion re 33 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass.
37
12/03/2015
REPLY to Response to Motion re 33 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by American Humanist Association.
38
02/05/2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motions for Attorney Fees, in favor of American Humanist Association, Dessa Blackthorn against Baxter County, Arkansas, Mickey Pendergrass in the amount of $52,358.76. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 5, 2016.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.