Amy Alise Blankenship
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00406 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/26/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
11/26/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
4
11/26/2018
Excepted from Electronic Filing
11/26/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/26/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/27/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
11/27/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
9
11/27/2018
Order to be Excepted from Electronic Filing
10
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
13
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
14
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
12/04/2018
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
16
12/08/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.