Amy Rae Jacobsen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00267 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/13/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
08/13/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
08/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
08/13/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
08/14/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/14/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
08/14/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/14/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
08/15/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
10
08/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
11
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
12
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
13
08/18/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
14
08/28/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
08/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
08/30/2018
Certification of Domestic Support Payments
16
08/30/2018
Schedules A-J
17
09/05/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
18
09/13/2018
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
19
09/18/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
20
09/18/2018
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
21
09/18/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
22
09/18/2018
Certificate of Service
09/19/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/25/2018
Withdrawal of Document / Motion
09/25/2018
Calendar Remark (Moot / Complied) (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
10/09/2018
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
25
10/15/2018
Proceeding Memo
26
10/16/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
11/02/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
11/16/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.