Anchorage School District v. M.G. et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cv-00157 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
158
02/23/2018
ORDER: on Motion to Stay Put 127 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/23/2018. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
173
06/15/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
174
06/15/2018
175
06/18/2018
Judgment
176
07/02/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
07/05/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
178
07/12/2018
Notice of Appeal
179
07/12/2018
Notice (Other)
180
07/16/2018
USCA Case Number
181
07/16/2018
USCA Scheduling Order
182
07/16/2018
Attorney Fees
183
07/16/2018
Affidavit
184
07/16/2018
Affidavit
185
07/16/2018
Affidavit
186
07/16/2018
Attorney Fees
187
07/16/2018
Affidavit
188
07/16/2018
Affidavit
189
07/16/2018
Affidavit
190
07/16/2018
Attorney Fees
191
07/16/2018
Affidavit
192
07/16/2018
Affidavit
193
07/16/2018
Affidavit
194
07/16/2018
Affidavit
195
07/24/2018
Notice of Appearance
196
07/25/2018
Errata
197
07/26/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
07/27/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
199
08/08/2018
Expedite
200
08/08/2018
Affidavit
201
08/08/2018
Compel
203
08/09/2018
Notice (Other)
204
08/09/2018
Intervene
205
08/09/2018
Memorandum
206
08/09/2018
Expedite
207
08/10/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
208
08/10/2018
Affidavit
209
08/10/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite
210
08/10/2018
Order on Motion to Expedite
211
08/13/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
212
08/13/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
213
08/13/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
214
08/13/2018
Affidavit
215
08/13/2018
Notice (Other)
08/14/2018
Order on Motion to Intervene (Text entry; no document attached.)
218
08/15/2018
Notice (Other)
219
08/16/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
220
08/17/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
221
08/20/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
222
08/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
223
08/20/2018
Response in Support of Motion
224
08/20/2018
Affidavit
225
08/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
226
08/20/2018
Affidavit
227
08/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
228
08/20/2018
Affidavit
08/21/2018
Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application (Text entry; no document attached.)
229
08/20/2018
Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov
230
08/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
231
08/20/2018
Affidavit
233
08/22/2018
USCA Order
234
08/22/2018
Notice (Other)
235
08/23/2018
Hearing
236
08/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
237
08/23/2018
Notice (Other)
240
08/23/2018
Notice (Other)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
245
08/26/2018
Additional Related Document
246
08/29/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
247
08/29/2018
Affidavit
248
08/29/2018
Notice (Other)
249
08/30/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
250
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
251
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
252
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
253
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
254
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
255
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
256
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
257
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
258
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
259
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
260
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
261
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
262
08/30/2018
Seal
263
08/30/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/31/2018
Order on Motion to Seal Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
266
09/04/2018
Notice (Other)
267
09/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
268
09/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
270
09/05/2018
Affidavit
271
09/05/2018
Notice (Other)
274
09/12/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
275
09/13/2018
USCA Mandate
276
09/13/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
277
09/13/2018
Notice (Other)
278
09/13/2018
Hearing
09/17/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
280
09/17/2018
Notice (Other)
281
09/17/2018
Notice (Other)
282
09/18/2018
Order
283
09/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
285
09/18/2018
Affidavit
286
09/18/2018
Notice (Other)
287
09/18/2018
Notice (Other)
288
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
09/19/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
289
09/19/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
291
09/20/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
292
09/24/2018
Notice (Other)
294
09/26/2018
Stay
295
10/02/2018
Notice (Other)
296
10/02/2018
Notice (Other)
10/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
299
10/08/2018
Notice (Other)
300
10/10/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
10/10/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
302
10/10/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
303
10/10/2018
Notice (Other)
306
10/11/2018
USCA Order
307
10/11/2018
Attorney Fees
10/11/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
309
10/12/2018
Notice (Other)
311
10/12/2018
Additional Related Document
312
10/17/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
313
10/22/2018
Notice (Other)
314
10/22/2018
Strike
315
10/22/2018
Strike
316
10/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
317
10/23/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
318
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
319
10/26/2018
Transcript
320
10/29/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
321
10/29/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
322
10/30/2018
Notice (Other)
323
10/30/2018
Strike
324
10/31/2018
Response in Opposition to Motion
325
11/02/2018
Notice (Other)
326
11/05/2018
Notice (Other)
327
11/05/2018
Reply to Response to Motion
328
12/06/2018
Notice (Other)
329
01/15/2019
Notice (Other)
330
01/15/2019
Expedite
331
01/15/2019
Settlement
332
01/15/2019
Notice (Other)
333
01/16/2019
Notice (Other)
334
01/16/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite
335
01/16/2019
Notice of Appearance
336
01/16/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
337
01/22/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
338
01/22/2019
Reply to Response to Motion
339
01/23/2019
Response in Opposition to Motion
340
01/24/2019
Supplement
341
01/24/2019
Order on Motion for Settlement
342
02/05/2019
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
343
02/06/2019
Order on Motion to Strike
344
02/12/2019
Transcript
345
02/15/2019
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
346
02/19/2019
Response to Order
347
02/19/2019
Order
348
02/20/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
349
03/06/2019
Stay
350
03/07/2019
Order on Motion to Stay
351
03/27/2019
Dismiss
352
03/27/2019
Order
353
03/28/2019
USCA Mandate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.