Anderson v. City of Seward
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cv-00289 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/12/2018
Complaint
2
12/12/2018
Civil Cover Sheet
3
12/31/2018
Order
4
03/12/2019
Unissued Summons
03/12/2019
1 - Summons Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/26/2019
Clerk's Notice of Deficiency (Proof of Service) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
04/02/2019
Notice of Appearance
7
04/09/2019
Affidavit of Service
8
04/16/2019
Answer to Complaint
9
05/09/2019
Answer to Counterclaim
10
05/09/2019
Initial Case Status Report Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.